EP2424385 - A NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN APPLE EXTRACT AND REDUCING FOOD ALLERGY SYMPTOMS, ESPECIALLY IN CHILDREN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLVOET, Sébastien Chemin de l'Union 19 CH-1073 Savigny / CH | 02 /
MERCENIER, Annick Chemin de Rente 10 CH-1030 Bussigny / CH | 03 /
ZUERCHER, Adrian Stapfenackerstrasse 95 CH-3018 Bern / CH | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Corticchiato, Olivier, et al Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Corticchiato, Olivier, et al Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2012/10] | Corticchiato, Olivier Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 10715818.0 | 23.04.2010 | WO2010EP55431 | Priority number, date | EP20090158980 | 28.04.2009 Original published format: EP 09158980 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010124997 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2424385 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2424385 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61P37/08, A61K36/73, A23L1/305, A23L1/29 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/304, A23V2250/2132 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/2132, A23V2200/304 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2012/10] | A23L1/30, A61P37/08, A61K36/73 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERNÄHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT APFELEXTRAKT ZUR REDUKTION VON LEBENSMITTELALLERGIESYMPTOMEN, VOR ALLEM BEI KINDERN | [2014/25] | English: | A NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN APPLE EXTRACT AND REDUCING FOOD ALLERGY SYMPTOMS, ESPECIALLY IN CHILDREN | [2012/10] | French: | COMPOSITION NUTRITIVE COMPORTANT UN EXTRAIT DE POMME ET RÉDUCTION DES SYMPTÔMES D'ALLERGIE ALIMENTAIRE, SPÉCIALEMENT CHEZ LES ENFANTS | [2014/30] |
Former [2012/10] | NÄHRZUSAMMENSETZUNG, UMFASSEND EINEN APFELEXTRAKT, DER NAHRUNGSMITTELALLERGIESYMPTOME LINDERT, INSBESONDERE BEI KINDERN | ||
Former [2012/10] | COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE POMME ET RÉDUISANT LES SYMPTÔMES D'ALLERGIE ALIMENTAIRE, EN PARTICULIER CHEZ DES ENFANTS | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 13.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Observations by third parties | 24.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2010 | AT | 10.12.2014 | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | CZ | 10.12.2014 | DK | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | HR | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MK | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | SM | 10.12.2014 | NO | 10.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | IE | 23.04.2015 | LU | 23.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.04.2010 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 10.12.2014 | |
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 10.12.2014 | |
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2006003750 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,16 * examples Experiment,1,2 * [I] 1-16; | [I]JP2006096694 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD, et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0020] , [0022]; claims 1,2 *; | [XI]JP2009060800 (TSUJIDO KAGAKU KK) [X] 1,2,6,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0013] , [0015] , [0027] - [0029] * [I] 1-16; | [A]EP2044851 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 7* paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011]; claims 1-3 *; | [I] - AKIYAMA ET AL, "Dietary unripe apple polyphenol inhibits the development of food allergies in murine models", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050815), vol. 579, no. 20, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 4485 - 4491, XP005010831 [I] 1-16 * page 4485, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4485, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 4486, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 4489, paragraph 3 * * page 4489, column 2, paragraphs 1,4 * * page 4490, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [I] - TAKANO FUMIHIDE ET AL, "Aqueous extract of peanut skin and its main constituent procyanidin Al suppress serum IgE and IgG1 levels in mice-immunized with ovalbumin", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200705), Database accession no. PREV200700417572, XP002536854 [I] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/bpb.30.922 | [ ] - BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (200705), vol. 30, no. 5, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 922 - 927 | by applicant | - M. KIMATA ET AL., CLIN.EXP.ALLERGY, (2000), vol. 30, pages 501 - 508 | - M. P. NAIR ET AL., BIOCHIM.BIOPHYS.ACTA, (2002), vol. 1593, pages 29 - 36 | - W. DORSCH ET AL., INT.ARCH.ALLERGY.IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 97, pages 1 - 7 | - KOJIMA ET AL., ALLERGOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (2000), vol. 49, pages 69 - 73 | - BIOSCI. BIOTECHNO, BIOCHEM. 69, (2005), vol. 69, no. 4, pages 829 - 832 |