EP2411292 - METHOD OF PACKING A BATCH OF PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/05] | METHOD FOR PACKAGING A LOT OF PRODUCTS | ||
[2012/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville-sur-Mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville sur Mer / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANNIN, Michel c/o Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France F-76930 Octeville-sur-Mer / FR | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10715973.3 | 24.03.2010 | WO2010FR50533 | Priority number, date | FR20090001433 | 26.03.2009 Original published format: FR 0901433 | [2012/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010109135 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411292 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411292 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B65/00, B65B43/10, B65B11/50, B65B17/02 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
B65B11/004 (EP,US);
B65B11/58 (EP,US);
B65B59/003 (EP);
B65D71/38 (EP,US);
B65B5/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN EINER LADUNG VON PRODUKTEN | [2012/36] | English: | METHOD OF PACKING A BATCH OF PRODUCTS | [2012/36] | French: | PROCEDE D'EMBALLAGE D'UN LOT DE PRODUITS | [2012/05] |
Former [2012/05] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERPACKUNG EINER PRODUKTCHARGE | ||
Former [2012/05] | METHOD FOR PACKAGING A LOT OF PRODUCTS | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 18.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2010 | AT | 30.01.2013 | CY | 30.01.2013 | CZ | 30.01.2013 | DK | 30.01.2013 | EE | 30.01.2013 | FI | 30.01.2013 | HR | 30.01.2013 | LT | 30.01.2013 | LV | 30.01.2013 | MK | 30.01.2013 | MT | 30.01.2013 | NL | 30.01.2013 | PL | 30.01.2013 | RO | 30.01.2013 | SE | 30.01.2013 | SI | 30.01.2013 | SK | 30.01.2013 | SM | 30.01.2013 | TR | 30.01.2013 | IE | 24.03.2013 | LU | 24.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 30.04.2013 | NO | 30.04.2013 | GR | 01.05.2013 | ES | 11.05.2013 | IS | 30.05.2013 | PT | 30.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MK | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
TR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
NO | 30.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR1190156 (M.PIERRE-ANDRE CHEVALIER) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2946165 (COTE OMER E) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5765336 (NEAGLE CLAUD ANDREW [US], et al)[A] 1; | [A]US2004031236 (BOIX JAEN JOSE [ES]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2890044 (SMURFIT SOCAR PACKAGING SOC PA [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2899873 (OTOR SA [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |