EP2418963 - CHOCOLATE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cadbury UK Limited P.O. Box 12 Bournville Lane Bournville Birmingham, West Midlands B30 2LU / GB | [2015/03] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Mondelez UK Holdings & Services Limited P.O. Box 12 Bournville Lane Bournville Birmingham B30 2LU / GB | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Cadbury UK Limited P.O. Box 12 Bournville Lane Bournville Birmingham B30 2LU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALES, Andrew Flat 5 Raford House 49 Kenilworth Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 6JJ / GB | 02 /
BROWN, Anthony James 10 Tudor Court Bath Road Thatcham Berkshire RG18 3HB / GB | 03 /
CHILTON, Christopher Cadbury UK Limited PO Box 12 Bournville Lane Bournville Birmingham West Midlands B30 2LU / GB | 04 /
WINDER, Philip John 157 Cartmell Road Woodseats Sheffield S8 0NL / GB | 05 /
SAMANT, Shantanu Cadbury India Limited, Cadbury House Cadbury House, 19-Bhulabhai Desai Road Mumbai, Maharashtra PIN 4000026 / IN | 06 /
SRIRAM, K Cadbury Egypt Food Indust Industrial Zone B2 10th of Ramadan 44637 / EG | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [2014/24] |
Former [2012/08] | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10716004.6 | 19.04.2010 | WO2010GB00779 | Priority number, date | GB20090006662 | 17.04.2009 Original published format: GB 0906662 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010119268 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2418963 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2418963 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/36, A23G1/38, A23G1/32 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
A23G1/32 (EP,US);
A23G1/38 (EP,US);
A23G3/36 (EP,US);
A23L7/126 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | A23G1/00, A23G3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHOKOLADE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2013/48] | English: | CHOCOLATE COMPOSITION | [2012/08] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CHOCOLAT | [2012/08] |
Former [2012/08] | SCHOKOLADENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 31.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2015
18.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2015
18.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | 20.04.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.03.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2010 | AT | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CH | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | LI | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | IE | 19.04.2015 | LU | 19.04.2015 | MT | 19.04.2015 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/21] | HU | 19.04.2010 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.04.2015 | ||
MT | 19.04.2015 | ||
Former [2019/38] | HU | 19.04.2010 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.04.2015 | ||
MT | 19.04.2015 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 19.04.2010 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.04.2015 | ||
MT | 19.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 19.04.2010 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CH | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 19.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [I]GB2201878 (UNITED BISCUITS LTD) [I] 1-11 * page 6, line 27 - line 35; claim - *; | [A]EP0716810 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]US2004086615 (JOHNSON SCOTT D [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * claim -; table 9 *; | [XI]US2007014904 (GIRSH LEONARD S [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * paragraphs [0022] , [0158] , [0159] , [0201]; claim - * [I] 9; | [A]WO2008064962 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1992232 (KRAFT FOODS R & D INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A] - AFOAKWA ET AL, "Factors influencing rheological and textural qualities in chocolate - a review", TRENDS IN FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.TIFS.2007.02.002, (20070510), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0924-2244, pages 290 - 298, XP022069623 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tifs.2007.02.002 |