EP2417809 - CONVEYING SYNCHRONIZATION STRATUM INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHEORGHIU, Valentin, A. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 02 /
PALANKI, Ravi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 03 /
AGASHE, Parag, Arun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/07] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10716152.3 | 08.04.2010 | [2016/07] | WO2010US30436 | Priority number, date | US20090167652P | 08.04.2009 Original published format: US 167652 P | US20100755284 | 06.04.2010 Original published format: US 755284 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010118261 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2417809 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417809 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (KR);
H04L7/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERMITTELN VON SYNCHRONISATIONS-STRATUM-INFORMATIONEN | [2012/07] | English: | CONVEYING SYNCHRONIZATION STRATUM INFORMATION | [2012/07] | French: | TRANSPORT D'INFORMATION DE COUCHE DE SYNCHRONISATION | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 01.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12176557.2 / EP2515592 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2010 | AT | 17.02.2016 | BE | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | HR | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | IT | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MK | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | SM | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | IE | 08.04.2016 | LU | 08.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | NO | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4718109 (BREEDEN ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-10,24,26,28-32,34,39-42,44,46-52 * abstract * * column 2, lines 6-32 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 36 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 35 * * figure - *; | [X]EP0592209 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,10,22-24,26,41-43,49,50 * abstract * * page 3, lines 3-50 * * page 5, lines 23-48 * * page 6, lines 10-32 * * page 7, lines 10-31 * * page 9, line 51 - page 10, line 18 * * figure - * * claim - *; | [X]US6622022 (DU YONGGANG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-10,24,26,28-32,34,39-42,44,46-52 * abstract * * column 1, lines 30-47 * * column 2, lines 17-26 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 18 * * column 5, lines 16-62 * * figure 4 * * claim - *; | [X]US2006251017 (BISHOP DONALD M [US]) [X] 1,4,6-10,24,26,28-32,34,39-42,44,46-52 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0039] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0058] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0082] * * paragraph [0089] * * figure - * * claim - *; | [X] - JUSTIN C I CHUANG ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "AUTONOMOUS TIME SYNCHRONIZATION AMONG RADIO PORTS IN WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS", PERSONAL COMMUNICATION - FREEDOM THROUGH WIRELESS TECHNOLOGY. SECAUCUS, NJ., MAY 18 - 20, 1993; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930518), vol. CONF. 43, ISBN 978-0-7803-1267-8, pages 700 - 705, XP000393279 [X] 1,2,4-6,10,22-24,26,41-46,49,50 * abstract * * page 701, column l, lines 4-10 * * page 702, column r, lines 22-55 * | [X] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Inter eNB over-the-air communication (OTAC) for LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-091373_OTAC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090318), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090318, XP050338963 [X] 1,18-20,25,27 * the whole document * | [X] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Self-Synchronization", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-090700, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090321), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090321, XP050341087 [X] 1,25,27-29 * abstract * * paragraph [02.2] * * paragraph [0003] * | [XP] - TSG-RAN WG4, "Support for time and frequency synchronization using network listening", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-095423_R4-093465, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100102), vol. RAN WG2, no. Valencia, Spain; 20100118, XP050420672 [XP] 7-9,30-40,47,48,51,52 * the whole document * | [XP] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Further Consideration on LTE TDD HeNB Synchronization Use Case and Extra Signaling", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-100050, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100112), vol. RAN WG4, no. Sophia; 20100118, XP050427771 [XP] 7-9,11-16,30-40,47,48,51,52 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0003] * * figure 3.1 * |