EP2404163 - SEMI-OPEN RESONATOR ASSEMBLY IN THE FORM OF A REENTRANT CAVITY AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING A SAMPLE USING THE RESONATOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Norbert 36 George Street Staines Middx, TW18 4LB / GB | 02 /
VITUSEVICH, Svetlana Nordstr. 142 A 52353 Düren / DE | 03 /
DANYLYUK, Serhiy Wiesenstr. 6 B 52428 Jülich / DE | [2012/09] |
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
KLEIN, Norbert 36 Georges Street Staines Middx, TW18 4LB / GB | ||
02 /
VITUSEVICH, Svetlana Nordstr. 142 A 52353 Düren / DE | |||
03 /
DANYLYUK, Serhiy Wiesenstr. 6 B 52428 Jülich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10716269.5 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010DE00200 | Priority number, date | DE20091011069 | 02.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009011069 | US20090208937P | 02.03.2009 Original published format: US 208937 P | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010099778 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2404163 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2404163 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N22/00, G01R27/26, H01P7/04 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H01P7/04 (EP);
G01N22/00 (EP);
G01R27/2652 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/02] | G01N22/00, G01R27/26, H01P7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBOFFENE RESONATORANORDNUNG IN FORM EINES TOPFKREISES UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG EINER PROBE MIT DER RESONATORANORDNUNG | [2012/02] | English: | SEMI-OPEN RESONATOR ASSEMBLY IN THE FORM OF A REENTRANT CAVITY AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING A SAMPLE USING THE RESONATOR ASSEMBLY | [2012/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF RÉSONATEUR SEMI-OUVERT EN FORME D'UNE CAVITÉ RÉENTRANTE ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXAMEN D'UN ÉCHANTILLON AU MOYEN DU DISPOSITIF RÉSONATEUR | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 16.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2010 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | ES | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | HR | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | LV | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | MK | 27.11.2013 | MT | 27.11.2013 | NL | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | SM | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | IE | 23.02.2014 | LU | 23.02.2014 | NO | 27.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 23.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
LU | 23.02.2014 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 27.11.2013 | |
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 27.11.2013 | |
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | |
NO | 27.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH02272349 (NIPPON TOKUSHU KEISOKKI SEISAK) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [X]DE2328590 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,3 * page 3 - page 6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4103224 (TARO MIURA ET AL) [A] 2-9 * column 3 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-3 * * column 5, line 41 - line 44; claim 1 *; | [A]JPS5569043 (TDK ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 2-9 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5410796 (TDK ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 2-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP1091441 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 2-9 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-5,11-14 *; | [A]EP1371978 (TEWS ELEKTRONIK DIPL ING MANFR [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 39; figure 6 *; | [XD]WO2008040305 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]; KLEIN NORBERT [DE]; KRAUSE HANS-J) [XD] 10 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 5; figures 1-6 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 4 * * claim 16 *; | [A] - EBBE NYFORS AND PERTTI VAINIKAINEN, "INDUSTRIAL MICROWAVE SENSORS", INDUSTRIAL MICROWAVE SENSORS, (19890101), XP002334964 [A] 1-10 * figures 3.2, 3.13, 3.14 * * page 130, paragraph 2 * * page 153 - page 154 * | [A] - R.J.King, "Chapter 5 On-line Industrial Applications of Microwave Moisture Sensors", R.J.King, H. Baltes, W.Göpel, J. Hesse (Editors), K. Kupfer, A. Kraszewski, R. Knöchel (Guest Editors), Sensors Update, Special Topic: RF & Microwave Sensing of Moist Materials, Weinheim, Wiley-VCH, (2000), vol. 7, pages 109 - 170, ISBN 3-527-29821-5, XP002601615 [A] 1-10 * page 145 - page 147; figures 5.16, 5.18 * | [X] - KRAUSE H-J ET AL, "Dielectric microwave resonator for non-destructive evaluation of moisture and salinity", 9TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON NDT: ECNDT BERLIN 2006; SEPTEMBER 25 - 29, 2006, EUROPEAN FEDERATION FOR NON-DESTRUCTIVE TESTING, BERLIN, (20060929), ISBN 978-3-931381-86-8, pages 1 - 12, XP008104806 [X] 10 * figure 1 * | [A] - KRZYSZTOF A. MICHALSKI, "Chapter 5 "RIGOROUS ANALYSIS METHODS"", DARKO KAJFEZ AND PIERRE GUILLON (EDITORS): "DIELECTRIC RESONATORS", NOBLE PUBLISHING CORPORATION, ATLANTA, ISBN 1-884932-05-3, (1998), pages 185 - 257, URL: http://proxy.bookfi.org/genesis1/165000/1a2cea8e18f354506db042aa74ea80f1/_as/%5BDarko%20Kajfez%20and%20Pierre%20Guillon%5D_%EF%BB%BFDielectric%20Resonators(BookFi.org).pdf, (20110328), XP002630380 [A] 10 * page 191, paragraph 1 * * page 230, paragraph l - page 240 * | [A] - MATJAZ VALANTA, DANILO SUVOROV, SRECO MACEKA, "Measurement error analysis in the determination of microwave dielectric properties using cavity reflection method", FERROELECTRICS, Switzerland, (1996), vol. 176, ISSN 0015-0193, pages 167 - 177, XP009146429 [A] 10 * abstract * * page 168, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00150199608223608 | [A] - SVETLANA A VITUSEVICH ET AL, "Design and Characterization of an All-Cryogenic Low Phase-Noise Sapphire | [A] - ZHIHONG MA, SEICHI OKAMURA AND TOMOYASU KAWASAKI, "A FUNDAMENTAL STUDY ON MICROSTRIP SENSOR FOR MEASURING WATER CONTENT AND ION CONDUCTIVITY", FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE INTERACTION WITH WATER AND MOIST SUBSTANCES, Weimar / Germany, (20010513), pages 462 - 467, URL: http://www.isema-online.com/uploads/2001_Proceedings.pdf, (20110329), XP002630492 [A] 10 * the whole document * |