EP2553695 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING A TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAD, Josef Alfred Bischoffstr. 4 92318 Neumarkt / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Klaus Querstr. 8 90530 Wendelstein / DE | 03 /
SCHLAGER, Johann Flachsröststr. 58b 90475 Nürnberg / DE | [2013/06] | Application number, filing date | 10716283.6 | 29.03.2010 | [2017/22] | WO2010EP02129 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011120543 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553695 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2553695 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/06, H01F41/10, H01F41/02 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H01F27/06 (EP,KR);
H01F41/02 (EP,KR);
H01F41/10 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MONTAGE EINES TRANSFORMATORS | [2013/06] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING A TRANSFORMER | [2013/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE D'UN TRANSFORMATEUR | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 29.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2010 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | IT | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | MT | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 31.05.2017 | |
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2001167961 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-6,8,10,12,14 * figures 5-7,11-13 * [I] 7,9,11,13; | [XI]JP2003086429 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-6,8,10,12,14 * figures 1-5 * [I] 7,9,11,13; | [XI]JPH0562847 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-6,8,12,14 * figures 1-5,7 * [I] 7,9-11,13; | [A]DE3032315 (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG [DE]) [A] 9,11 * page 7, lines 19-33; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US3774135 (KASHIMA Y) [A] 9,11 * column 2, lines 35-47 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 2 * * column 6, lines 1-31 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE10238521 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0028] , [0031]; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP1997117 |