EP2406355 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING A LOW VOC HYDROCARBON DILUENT FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | LOW VOC HYDROCARBON DILUENT FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS | ||
[2017/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2013/36] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Total Raffinage Marketing 24 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTELYNCK, Antoine 15 rue du Vexin 78440 Brueil en Vexin / FR | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/03] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10716381.8 | 11.03.2010 | [2018/18] | WO2010FR50425 | Priority number, date | FR20090001157 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: FR 0901157 | [2012/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010103244 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406355 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406355 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C10M101/02, C10M107/02, C08K5/01, C08K5/09, C08K5/101, C08L83/04, C09D127/06, C09J183/04, C10G9/00, C10G11/00, C10G45/58, C10G47/00 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
C10M101/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/01 (EP,KR,US);
C08L27/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L83/00 (US);
C09D7/20 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/40 (KR);
C10G45/58 (EP,KR,US);
C10G7/00 (KR);
C10M107/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2300/1011 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2300/1055 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1074 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/301 (EP,US);
C10G2300/302 (EP,US);
C10G2300/304 (EP,US);
C10G2300/802 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2205/173 (EP,US);
C10N2030/74 (EP,US);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/06, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | C10M101/02, C10M107/02, C08K5/01, C08K5/09, C08K5/101, C08L83/04, C09D7/06, C09D127/06, C09J183/04, C10G9/00, C10G11/00, C10G45/58, C10G47/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | 12.10.2011 | BA | 12.10.2011 | ME | 12.10.2011 | RS | 12.10.2011 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND EIN LOW-VOC-KOHLENWASSERSTOFFVERDÜNNUNGSMITTEL FÜR BAUSTOFFE | [2017/34] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING A LOW VOC HYDROCARBON DILUENT FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS | [2017/34] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN DILUANT HYDROCARBONE A BAS TAUX DE COV POUR MATERIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION | [2017/34] |
Former [2012/03] | LOW-VOC-KOHLENWASSERSTOFFVERDÜNNUNGSMITTEL FÜR BAUSTOFFE | ||
Former [2012/03] | LOW VOC HYDROCARBON DILUENT FOR CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS | ||
Former [2012/03] | DILUANT HYDROCARBONE A BAS TAUX DE COV POUR MATERIAUX DE CONSTRUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 10.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2010 | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | IT | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | MT | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | PT | 03.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.03.2010 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2001021747 (MASUBUCHI NAGANORI [JP], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0025]; claim 1; tables 1,4 *; | [X]US2005197256 (DUNLOP CARL [ZA], et al) [X] 1-3,7,13 * paragraph [0027]; claims 1,2,9,15,20,22,23; table 4 *; | [XI]US7442739 (HATFIELD STEPHEN F [US]) [X] 13-17 * column 5, lines 46-50; claim 1; table 2 * [I] 1-17; | [X]US2009014354 (KNUUTTILA PEKKA [FI], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0077] , [0096]; figure 3; tables 3,5,7,13 *; | [T] - IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD (CHEMICALS DEPT), "IDEMITSU IP Solvent", INTERNET ARTICLE, pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.idemitsu-chemicals.de/files/datasheets/broschures/PerformanceChemicals/IPSolvent.pdf, (20091008), XP002549391 [T] 1-15 * page 6 * |