Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2421573 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2013 | B1 | EP2421573 | 29.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US31990 | 22.04.2010 | US42939209 | 24.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010124049 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2011 | A3 | WO2010124049 | 28.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42939209 | 24.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010274352 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42939209 | 24.04.2009 |