EP2421573 - ENDOPROSTHESIS WITH SELECTIVE DRUG COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Mailstop A150 Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUEHLING, Michael Ruemannstrass 59 80804 Munich / DE | 02 /
SCHEUERMANN, Torsten Viktor-scheffel-Str. 20 80803 Munich / DE | 03 /
WEBER, Jan Holdaal 49 NL-6228 GJ Maastricht / NL | 04 /
XU, Yixin 416 Grove Street Unit B-3 Newton MA 02462 / US | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2012/09] | Application number, filing date | 10716438.6 | 22.04.2010 | WO2010US31990 | Priority number, date | US20090429392 | 24.04.2009 Original published format: US 429392 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010124049 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2421573 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2421573 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/08, A61L31/10, A61L31/14, A61L31/16 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/088 (EP,US);
A61L31/146 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2300/45 (EP,US);
A61L2300/61 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOPROTHESE MIT SELEKTIVEN ARZNEIMITTEL-ÜBERZÜGEN | [2012/09] | English: | ENDOPROSTHESIS WITH SELECTIVE DRUG COATINGS | [2012/09] | French: | ENDOPROTHÈSE AVEC DES REVÊTEMENTS DE MÉDICAMENT SÉLECTIFS | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 13.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2010 | AT | 03.04.2013 | BE | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | IT | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MK | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | SM | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | LU | 22.04.2013 | FR | 03.06.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MK | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
FR | 03.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
SM | 03.04.2013 | ||
FR | 03.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
FR | 03.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
FR | 03.06.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006129215 (HELMUS MICHAEL N [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,11,13-17 * page 4, paragraph 36 * * page 6, paragraphs 64-66 * * page 8, paragraph 96 - page 9, paragraph 99 * * page 10, paragraph 110 * * claim - * [I] 5,9,12,18-26; | [X]WO2007143433 (SETAGON INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11,13,14,16,17 * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 4, paragraph 9 - page 5, paragraph 10 * * page 49, paragraphs 123-124 * * page 58, paragraph 147 - page 59, paragraph 149 *; | [A]WO2008063539 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * claim - *; | [XP]WO2009089382 (TELESIS RES LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1,3-5,7,8,10,11,13,19 * page 8, paragraph 40 - page 9, paragraph 41 ** claims 1,8,13,22,23 * | by applicant | - HUANG ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2003), vol. 24, pages 2177 - 2187 | - KILIAN ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2005), vol. 26, pages 1819 - 1827 | - EGERHAZI ET AL., APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 247, pages 182 - 187 |