EP2457390 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING STEREOPHONIC OR PSEUDO-STEREOPHONIC AUDIO SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states StormingSwiss Sàrl Avenue de la Gottaz 30 c/o Fidacor Sàrl 1110 Morges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Storming Swiss Sàrl Avenue de la Gottaz 30 C/O Fidacor Sàrl 1110 Morges / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAR, Clemens c/o Melanie Gruemmer Chesa dals Peschs Chapella CH-7526 Cinuos-chel / CH | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 10716543.3 | 29.04.2010 | WO2010EP55877 | Priority number, date | CH20090001159 | 22.07.2009 Original published format: CH 11592009 | CH20090001776 | 18.11.2009 Original published format: CH 17762009 | [2012/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011009650 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457390 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04S5/00 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H04S5/00 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG STEREOPHONER ODER PSEUDOSTEREOPHONER AUDIOSIGNALE | [2012/22] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING STEREOPHONIC OR PSEUDO-STEREOPHONIC AUDIO SIGNALS | [2012/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'OPTIMISER DES SIGNAUX AUDIO STÉRÉOPHONIQUES OU PSEUDO-STÉRÉOPHONIQUES | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 28.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 30.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5235646 (WILDE MARTIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 4, line 27 - column 4, line 41 * * column 8, line 13 - column 8, line 47 ** figures 1-2 *; | [X]US6111958 (MAHER ROBERT CRAWFORD [US]) [X] 1-28 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 56 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 61 * * figures 1-3,5,6 * | by applicant | US5173944 | EP0825800 | EP1850639 | EP2124486 |