EP2413755 - MACHINE FOR INFUSION PREPARATION, IN PARTICULAR ESPRESSO COFFEE, SUPPLYING GROUP AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rancilio Group S.p.A. Viale Della Repubblica N. 40 20010 Villastanza Di Parabiago (MI) / IT | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARBONINI, Carlo c/o Rancilio Group S.p.A. Viale Della Republicca N. 40 20010 Villastanza Di Parabiago (MI) / IT | 02 /
PORZIO, Giancarlo c/o Rancilio Group S.p.A. Viale Della Republicca N. 40 20010 Villastanza Di Parabiago (MI) / IT | 03 /
FERRARESI, Carlo c/o Politecnico di Torino Corsi Duca degli Abruzzi N. 24 10129 Torino / IT | 04 /
FRANCO, Walter c/o Politecnico di Torino Corsi Duca degli Abruzzi N. 24 10129 Torino / IT | 05 /
QUAGLIA, Giuseppe c/o Politecnico di Torino Corsi Duca degli Abruzzi N. 24 10129 Torino / IT | 06 /
ODERIO, Riccardo c/o Politecnico di Torino Corsi Duca degli Abruzzi N. 24 10129 Torino / IT | [2012/38] |
Former [2012/06] | 01 /
CARBONINI, Carlo c/o RANCHILIO GROUP S.P.A VIALE DELLA REPUBBLICA NO.40 20010 VILLASTANZA DI PARABIAGO (MI) / IT | ||
02 /
PORZIO, Giancarlo c/o RANCHILIO GROUP S.P.A VIALE DELLA REPUBBLICA NO.40 20010 VILLASTANZA DI PARABIAGO (MI) / IT | |||
03 /
FERRARESI, Carlo c/o POLITECNICO DI TORINO CORSO DUCA DEGLI ABRUZZI NO.24 10129 TORINO / IT | |||
04 /
FRANCO, Walter c/o POLITECNICO DI TORINO CORSO DUCA DEGLI ABRUZZI NO.24 10129 TORINO / IT | |||
05 /
QUAGLIA, Giuseppe c/o POLITECNICO DI TORINO CORSO DUCA DEGLI ABRUZZI NO.24 10129 TORINO / IT | |||
06 /
ODERIO, Riccardo c/o POLITECNICO DI TORINO CORSO DUCA DEGLI ABRUZZI NO.24 10129 TORINO / IT | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10717236.3 | 31.03.2010 | WO2010IB51407 | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00250 | 01.04.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090250 | [2012/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010113125 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2413755 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2413755 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/56, A47J31/46, A47J31/36 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
A47J31/56 (EP,US);
A47J31/3685 (EP,US);
A47J31/465 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUR AUFGUSSZUBEREITUNG, INSBESONDERE ESPRESSO-KAFFEE, ZUFUHRAGGREGAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/06] | English: | MACHINE FOR INFUSION PREPARATION, IN PARTICULAR ESPRESSO COFFEE, SUPPLYING GROUP AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2012/06] | French: | MACHINE DE PRÉPARATION PAR INFUSION, EN PARTICULIER DU CAFÉ EXPRESSO, GROUPE D'ALIMENTATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 22.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2010 | AT | 23.01.2013 | BE | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MK | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | PL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | SM | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | IE | 31.03.2013 | LU | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5836236 (ROLFES PATRICK J [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,11 * column 2, lines 22-35 * * column 5, lines 14-64 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 42 * * claims 1,7,11 * * figure 23 * [A] 5,12; | [X]FR2907649 (CMA SPA SOCIETA PER AZIONI [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12 * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 7 * * page 8, line 32 - page 10, line 26 * * figure . *; | [X]FR2483762 (CIMBALI GIUSEPPE SPA OFF [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12 * page 5, line 22 - page 8, line 18; figure - *; | [AD]EP0465877 (RANCILIO MACCHINE CAFFE [IT]) [AD] 1,2,5-7,11,12 * the whole document * |