EP2425299 - SYSTEMS AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE-BASED LIGHTING CONTROL AND SECURITY CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/34] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHDOWN, Ian High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | 01 /
ASHDOWN, Ian High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10717248.8 | 07.04.2010 | WO2010IB51503 | Priority number, date | US20090174508P | 01.05.2009 Original published format: US 174508 P | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010125483 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2425299 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03B15/02, G08B13/196, G05B13/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
H05B47/125 (EP,US);
G03B15/02 (EP,KR,US);
G08B13/196 (EP,KR,US);
G08B13/19634 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/60 (KR,US);
H04N1/6086 (KR,US);
H04N9/68 (KR);
H05B47/105 (KR);
H05B47/11 (EP,KR,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BELEUCHTUNGSREGELUNG UND SICHERHEITSREGELUNG AUF BILDBASIS | [2012/10] | English: | SYSTEMS AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE-BASED LIGHTING CONTROL AND SECURITY CONTROL | [2012/10] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET APPAREIL POUR COMMANDE D'ÉCLAIRAGE EN FONCTION D'IMAGE ET COMMANDE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 07.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2017 | 12.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/18] | 14.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH07271426 (SHARP KK) [X] 1,2,9,10,15-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0017] - [0019] - [0023] , [0026] - [0034] - [0054] - [0055] - [0057] , [0068] * [Y] 3; | [XYI]WO03102889 (SIEMENS BUILDING TECH AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * page 3 - page 4; claims 8-10 * [Y] 3 [I] 15,17; | [Y]JP2008312026 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 3 * abstract * | Examination | WO0199474 | JPH10162967 | US2008298794 | by applicant | JPH07271426 | WO03102889 | JP2008312026 |