EP2415170 - VIRTUAL KNOB INTERFACE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TouchSensor Technologies, L.L.C. 203 North Gables Boulevard Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAMBAUGH, Deron 503 Kennedy St. Waterman Illinois 60556 / US | 02 /
MATTHEWS, Mark 0S700 Addison Ave. Lombard Illinois 60148 / US | 03 /
BURLESON, Mark 1744 Shari Lane Aurora Illinois 60505 / US | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Somervell, Thomas Richard, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10717332.0 | 01.04.2010 | WO2010US29651 | Priority number, date | US20090166575P | 03.04.2009 Original published format: US 166575 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010115014 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2415170 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/96, H03K17/98 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
H03K17/98 (EP,KR,US);
H03K17/96 (KR);
H03K17/9622 (EP,US);
H03K2217/94073 (EP,US);
H03K2217/96066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | VIRTUELL-KNOPF-SCHNITTSTELLE UND VERFAHREN | [2012/06] | English: | VIRTUAL KNOB INTERFACE AND METHOD | [2012/06] | French: | INTERFACE DE BOUTON VIRTUEL ET PROCÉDÉ | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 18.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 24.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/48] | 10.07.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005019766 (PHILIPP HARALD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,15-17 * page 15, line 15 - page 17, line 2 * * page 25, line 16 - line 22 * * page 26, line 21 - page 27, line 14 * * figures 4A-4B, 5, 7, 9A-9B,10,12 * [I] 7,8,12,18,19; | [XI]WO2006036950 (TOUCHSENSOR TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,15,16,20 * paragraphs [0249] , [ 270] - [0274] - [ 282] - [0283] - [ 295]; figures 35A-35B, 37A-37D, 38A-38B, 42D * [I] 3-5,7,8,18,19; | [XI]US2008111428 (BAIER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9-11,15,16 * paragraphs [0024] - [0035]; figures 1-2 * [I] 7,8,18,19; | [XI]EP1873609 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,15,16,21 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 25]; figure 3 * [I] 7,8,12-14,18,19,22 | Examination | US2005078027 | US4158216 | by applicant | US6320282 | US5594222 | US6310611 |