|
23.08.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
14.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Request for correction of obvious error |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.04.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
41 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |