Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8974627 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2015 | B2 | US2012067520 | 22.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 | WO2010EP55502 | 26.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5732047B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2015 | B2 | JP2012528204 | 12.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 | WO2010EP55502 | 26.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102449033B | Global Dossier | 07.05.2014 | B | CN102449033 | 09.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 | WO2010EP55502 | 26.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2763592 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | C | CA2763592 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 | WO2010EP55502 | 26.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2435502 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2016 | B1 | EP2435502 | 04.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 | WO2010EP55502 | 26.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2435502T | 30.01.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 | WO2010EP55502 | 26.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2610141T | 26.04.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 | WO2010EP55502 | 26.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010136280 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009022631 | 16.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009022631 | 25.05.2009 |