EP2435502 - CURABLE SILYL-GROUP CONTAINING COMPOSITIONS AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/14] | CURABLE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SILYL GROUPS, AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2016/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Evonik Goldschmidt GmbH Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUBERT, Frank Wiesfurthstraße 2a 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | 02 /
KNOTT, Wilfried Rechtstr. 9-11 45355 Essen / DE | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/14] | Application number, filing date | 10717606.7 | 26.04.2010 | [2016/42] | WO2010EP55502 | Priority number, date | DE20091022631 | 25.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009022631 | [2012/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010136280 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2435502 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2435502 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/46, C08L101/10, C09J101/10 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
C08G77/46 (EP,US);
C08B15/05 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (US);
C08L1/08 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (US);
C08L83/06 (US);
C09D183/04 (US);
C09D183/06 (US);
C09J183/04 (US);
C09J183/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE SILYLGRUPPEN ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2012/14] | English: | CURABLE SILYL-GROUP CONTAINING COMPOSITIONS AND ITS USE | [2016/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DES GROUPEMENTS SILYL ET LEUR EMPLOI | [2016/35] |
Former [2012/14] | CURABLE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SILYL GROUPS, AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2012/14] | COMPOSITIONS DURCISSABLES CONTENANT DES GROUPES SILYLE ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2010 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | MT | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | IE | 26.04.2017 | LU | 26.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 26.04.2010 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.04.2010 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.04.2010 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 19.10.2016 | |
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1586597 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * synthetic examples 1-10; paragraphs [0083] , [0086] , [0093] , [0095] , [0096]; examples 1-5; table - *; | [A]EP2036938 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0088] - [0097] - [0101]; example -; table 1 *; | [XP]EP2093244 (EVONIK GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-4 * claims 1-8 * | by applicant | EP1967550 | DE102008000360 | US7365145 | US3627722 | US3632557 | US3971751 | WO2005EP03706 | DE20081044373 |