EP2470617 - HEAT TRANSFER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V. Rio San Javier No. 10 Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio Tlalnepantla Estado de Mexico c.p. 54060 / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOW, Robert Elliott c/o Mexichem UK Limited P.O. Box 13 The Heath Runcom Cheshire WA7 4QF / GB | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2012/27] | Pugh, Robert Ian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10717722.2 | 16.04.2010 | WO2010GB00775 | Priority number, date | GB20090015004 | 28.08.2009 Original published format: GB 0915004 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011023923 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2470617 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C08J9/14, C11D7/50 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J9/146 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C11D7/30 (CN);
C11D7/50 (CN);
C09K2205/122 (CN);
C09K2205/126 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Title | German: | WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2012/27] | English: | HEAT TRANSFER COMPOSITIONS | [2012/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 04.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2013 | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 11.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008230738 (MINOR BARBARA HAVILAND [US], et al) [X] 5,6,10-56 * page 27; table 9 * * table 12 *; | [A]WO2009047542 (INEOS FLUOR HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009120619 (SIEVERT ALLEN CAPRON [US], et al) [X] 1,10-17,24-29,35,36,56 * paragraph [0098]; claim - *; | [XP]WO2010000993 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR], et al) [XP] 1,10-21,24-30,34-36,43-46,56 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2010002023 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-4,10-17,20,24-29,35,36,56 * claim -; table - *; | [XP]WO2010002020 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 5-17,20,24-29,35,36,56 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2010059677 (DU PONT [US], et al) [E] 1-56* examples 1,2; claims 1,2 * |