EP2421388 - FOODSTUFF INTERMEDIATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herbstreith & Fox KG, Pektin-Fabrik Turnstrasse 37 75305 Neuenbürg / DE | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOX, Gerhard, F. Hintere Schlosssteige 45 75305 Neuenbürg / DE | 02 /
ENDRESS, Hans-Ulrich Lidellweg 9 75305 Neuenbürg / DE | 03 /
RENTSCHLER, Christine Beethovenstrasse 47 75181 Pforzheim / DE | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Wacker, Jost Oliver, et al Frank Wacker Schön Patentanwälte Schwarzwaldstraße 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Wacker, Jost Oliver, et al Frank Wacker Schön Patentanwälte Schwarzwaldstraße 1A DE-75173 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10718070.5 | 20.04.2010 | [2013/04] | WO2010EP02397 | Priority number, date | DE20091018369 | 23.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009018369 | [2012/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010121776 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2421388 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2421388 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/052 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
A23L33/22 (EP,US);
A23L29/206 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEBENSMITTELZWISCHENPRODUKT | [2012/09] | English: | FOODSTUFF INTERMEDIATE | [2012/09] | French: | PRODUIT INTERMEDIAIRE ALIMENTAIRE | [2013/03] |
Former [2012/09] | PRODUIT INTERMÉDIAIRE ALIMENTAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 09.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | HR | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MK | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SE | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | SM | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | NO | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4226245 (DOEHLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US6149962 (LOH JIMBAY P [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US6455090 (UZUHASHI YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005039317 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 12, line 1 - line 6; example 1; claims 4, 11 *; | [A]US2006003081 (AQUINO LEONARDO J S [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |