EP2425399 - GEOMETRIC METHOD OF TRANSFORMING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCT Circuit Technologies International Limited Unit 32, the Hyde Building The Park, Carrickmines Dublin 18 / IE | [2017/03] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | ||
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson (France) SAS 12 rue Jules Horowitz 38000 Grenoble / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOBERT, Jean 28 rue du 14 Juillet F-94140 Alfortville / FR | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Zapalowicz, Francis Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10718131.5 | 27.04.2010 | WO2010EP55589 | Priority number, date | FR20090052754 | 27.04.2009 Original published format: FR 0952754 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010125041 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2425399 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
G06T3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | GEOMETRISCHES VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSFORMIEREN EINES ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN BILDES | [2012/10] | English: | GEOMETRIC METHOD OF TRANSFORMING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE. | [2012/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ GÉOMÉTRIQUE DE TRANSFORMATION D'UNE IMAGE BIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 30.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002122113 (FOOTE JONATHAN T [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0075] - [0089] - [0092] * [Y] 8-10; | [XY]EP1357516 (HITACHI SOFTWARE GLOBAL TECHNO [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figure 11 * [Y] 8-10; | [Y]EP1598778 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0061] - [0068] - [0076] - [0090] *; | [Y]WO2006031214 (SILICON OPTIX INC [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 15 * * page 10, lines 19-31 * * page 13, lines 12-30 *; | [A] - WOLBERG G, Digital Image Warping , passage, DIGITAL IMAGE WARPING, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 41 - 94,117, (19900101), XP002451703 [A] 1-6,10 * pages 44-45, paragraph 3.1.2 * * page 53, paragraph 3.4.2 - page 61, paragraph 3.5.4 * | [A] - ZELNIK-MANOR L ET AL, "Squaring the Circles in Panoramas", COMPUTER VISION, 2005. ICCV 2005. TENTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BEIJING, CHINA 17-20 OCT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051017), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7695-2334-7, pages 1292 - 1299, XP010856965 [A] 7 * abstract * * page 1292, paragraph 1 - page 1296, paragraph 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2005.231 | [A] - ERIC WEISSTEIN, "Gnomonic Projection", MATHWORLD, (20071027), URL: http://mathworld.wolfram.com/GnomonicProjection.html, (20091201), XP002558251 [A] 7 * the whole document * |