EP2427205 - PAR2 AGONISTS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF INFLUENZA VIRUS TYPE A INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique (INRA) 47, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states INSERM - Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut National De La Recherche Agronomique (INRA) 47, Rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERGNOLLE, Nathalie INSERM U563 CHU Purpan Place du Docteur Baylac BP3028 F-31024 Toulouse Cedex 3 / FR | 02 /
RITEAU, Béatrice Unité de Virologie et Immunologie Moléculaires Unité de Recherche 892 Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique Domaine de Vilvert F-78352 Jouy-en-Josas / FR | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/11] | Hirsch, Denise Marie Inserm-Transfert Industrial Property Department Biopark 7 rue Watt 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10718157.0 | 03.05.2010 | WO2010EP55980 | Priority number, date | EP20090305393 | 04.05.2009 Original published format: EP 09305393 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010128016 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2427205 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/08 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61P31/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Title | German: | PAR2-AGONISTEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON INFEKTIONEN MIT DEM GRIPPEVIRUS TYP A | [2012/11] | English: | PAR2 AGONISTS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF INFLUENZA VIRUS TYPE A INFECTIONS | [2012/11] | French: | AGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR PAR2 UTILISÉS DANS LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PRÉVENTION DES INFECTIONS DU VIRUS DE LA GRIPPE A | [2012/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 25.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03104268 (UNIV EDINBURGH [GB], et al) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [XY] - FELD MICHA ET AL, "Agonists of proteinase-activated receptor-2 enhance IFN-gamma-inducible effects on human monocytes: Role in influenza a infection", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (200805), vol. 180, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6903 - 6910, XP002610042 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3 | [A] - LAN ROMMEL S ET AL, "Modulation of airway smooth muscle tone by protease activated receptor-1,-2,-3 and -4 in trachea isolated from influenza A virus-infected mice", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (200001), vol. 129, no. 1, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 63 - 70, XP002610043 [A] 3 * the whole document * | Examination | - D TURNER ET AL, "Systematic review and economic decision modelling for the prevention and treatment of influenza A and B Executive summary The prevention and treatment of influenza A and B", HTA HEALTH TECHNOLOGY ASSESSMENT NHS R&D HTA PROGRAMME HEALTH TECHNOLOGY ASSESSMENT, (20030101), URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmedhealth/PMH0015076/pdf/summ735.pdf, (20150309), XP055174954 | by applicant | - HOLLENBERG, M. D. ET AL., CAN. J. PHYSIOL. PHARMACOL., (1997), vol. 75, pages 832 - 841 | - KAWABATA, A. ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1999), vol. 288, pages 358 - 370 | - HOWTHORNE ET AL., "A High-Throughput Microtiter Plate-Based Calcium Assay for the Study of Protease-Activated Receptor 2 Activation", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 290, pages 378 - 379 | - BARANY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 57, pages 1874 - 1878 | - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177 | - LIZARDI ET AL., BIOL. TECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197 | - ADRIAN CABESTRE, F.; P. MOREAU; B. RITEAU; E. C. IBRAHIM; C. LE DANFF; J. DAUSSET; N. ROUAS-FREISS; E. D. CAROSELLA; P. PAUL, "HLA-G expression in human melanoma cells: protection from NK cytolysis", J REPROD IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 43, pages 183 - 193 | - BACH, E. A.; M. AGUET; R. D. SCHREIBER, "The IFN gamma receptor: a paradigm for cytokine receptor signaling", ANNU REV IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 563 - 5691 | - BERNARD, D.; B. RITEAU; J. D. HANSEN; R. B. PHILLIPS; F. MICHEL; P. BOUDINOT; A. BENMANSOUR, "Costimulatory receptors in a teleost fish: typical CD28, elusive CTLA4", J IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 176, pages 4191 - 4200 | - CHIGNARD, M.; D. PIDARD., "Neutrophil and pathogen proteinases versus proteinase-activated receptor-2 lung epithelial cells: more terminators than activators", AM J RESPIR CELL MOL BIOL., (2006), vol. 34, pages 394 - 398 | - FELD, M.; V. M. SHPACOVITCH; C. EHRHARDT; C. KERKHOFF; M. D. HOLLENBERG; N. VERGNOLLE; S. LUDWIG; M. STEINHOFF, "Agonists of proteinase-activated receptor-2 enhance IFN-gamma-inducible effects on human monocytes: role in influenza A infection", J IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 180, pages 6903 - 6910, XP002610042 | - GARDELL LR; MA JN; SEITZBERG JG; KNAPP AE; SCHIFFER HH; TABATABAEI A; DAVIS CN; OWENS M; CLEMONS B; WONG KK, "Identification and characterization of novel small-molecule protease-activated receptor 2 agonists", J PHARMACOL EXP THER., (200812), vol. 327, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1124/jpet.108.142570, pages 799 - 808, XP055005360 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.108.142570 | - GRAHAM, M. B.; D. K. DALTON; D. GILTINAN; V. L. BRACIALE; T. A. STEWART; T. J. BRACIALE, "Response to influenza infection in mice with a targeted disruption in the interferon gamma gene", J EXP MED., (1993), vol. 178, pages 1725 - 1732 | - LAN, R. S.; G. A. STEWART; R. G. GOLDIE; P. J. HENRY, "Altered expression and in vivo lung function of protease-activated receptors during influenza A virus infection in mice", AM J PHYSIOL LUNG CELL MOL PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 286, doi:doi:10.1152/ajplung.00286.2003, pages L388 - 398, XP002574093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajplung.00286.2003 | - LEBOUDER, F.; E. MORELLO; G. F. RIMMELZWAAN; F. BOSSE; C. PECHOUX; B. DELMAS; B. RITEAU, "Annexin II incorporated into influenza virus particles supports virus replication by converting plasminogen into plasmin", J VIROL., (2008), vol. 82, pages 6820 - 6828 | - PASCALE, F.; V. CONTRERAS; M. BONNEAU; A. COURBET; S. CHILMONCZYK; C. BEVILACQUA; M. EPARAUD; V. NIBORSKI; S. RIFFAULT; A. M. BALA, "Plasmacytoid dendritic cells migrate in afferent skin lymph", J IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 180, pages 5963 - 5972 | - RAGE, F.; B. RITEAU; G. ALONSO; L. TAPIA-ARANCIBIA, "Brain-derived neurotrophic factor and neurotrophin-3 enhance somatostatin gene expression through a likely direct effect on hypothalamic somatostatin neurons", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1999), vol. 140, pages 909 - 916 | - RITEAU, B.; C. DE VAUREIX; F. LEFEVRE, "Trypsin increases pseudorabies virus production through activation of the ERK signalling pathway", J GEN VIROL., (2006), vol. 87, pages 1109 - 1112 | - RITEAU, B.; D. F. BARBER; E. O. LONG, "Vavl phosphorylation is induced by beta2 integrin engagement on natural killer cells upstream of actin cytoskeleton and lipid raft reorganization", J EXP MED., (2003), vol. 198, pages 469 - 474 | - RITEAU, B.; F. FAURE; C. MENIER; S. VIEL; E. D. CAROSELLA; S. AMIGORENA; N. ROUAS-FREISS, "Exosomes bearing HLA-G are released by melanoma cells", HUM IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 64, pages 1064 - 1072 | - RITEAU, B.; N. ROUAS-FREISS; C. MENIER; P. PAUL; J. DAUSSET; E. D. CAROSELLA, "HLA-G2, -G3, and -G4 isoforms expressed as nonmature cell surface glycoproteins inhibit NK and antigen-specific CTL cytolysis", J IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, pages 5018 - 5026 | - RITEAU, B.; P. MOREAU; C. MENIER; 1. KHALIL-DAHER; K. KHOSROTEHRANI; R. BRAS-GONCALVES; P. PAUL; J. DAUSSET; N. ROUAS-FREISS; E. D, "Characterization of HLA-Gl, -G2, -G3, and -G4 isoforms transfected in a human melanoma cell line", TRANSPLANT PROC., (2001), vol. 33, pages 2360 - 2364 | - STEINHOFF, M.; J. BUDDENKOTTE; V. SHPACOVITCH; A. RATTENHOLL; C. MOORMANN; N. VERGNOLLE; T. A. LUGER; M. D. HOLLENBERG, "Proteinase-activated receptors: transducers of proteinase-mediated signaling in inflammation and immune response", ENDOCR REV., (2005), vol. 26, pages 1 - 43 |