EP2427306 - DELTA ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Penta Robotics Patents B.V. Nigtevechtseweg 152ws 3633 XX Vreeland / NL | [2014/37] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Penta Robotics Patents B.V. Nigtevechtseweg 152ws 3633 XX VREELAND / NL | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Technische Universiteit Delft Et Al Stevinweg 1 2628 CN Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERDER, Justus Laurens Adelheidstraat 12A NL-2595 ED Den Haag / NL | 02 /
VAN DER WIJK, Volkert Benedeneind 299A NL-3405 CK Benschop / NL | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | [2014/37] |
Former [2013/19] | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau, De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | ||
Former [2012/11] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 10718737.9 | 03.05.2010 | WO2010NL50253 | Priority number, date | NL20092002839 | 05.05.2009 Original published format: NL 2002839 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010128849 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2427306 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2427306 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/10, B25J17/02, B25J19/00 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
B25J17/0266 (EP,US);
B25J19/002 (EP,US);
B25J9/0051 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DELTA ROBOTER | [2013/51] | English: | DELTA ROBOT | [2012/11] | French: | ROBOT DU TYPE DELTA | [2013/51] |
Former [2012/11] | DELTA-ROBOTER | ||
Former [2012/11] | ROBOT DELTA | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 02.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.08.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.05.2010 | AL | 10.09.2014 | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | ES | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | IT | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MK | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | SM | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | NO | 10.12.2014 | GR | 11.12.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.05.2010 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MK | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 03.05.2010 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2143498 (EMI LTD) [A] 1-8* page 2 - page 25, column 32 *; | [A]FR2690372 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9927320 (RENISHAW PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2005252329 (DEMERS JEAN-GUY [CA]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0042] *; | [A]FR2880575 (ISIS INTELLIGENT SURGICAL INST [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 23 *; | [A]DE102008005300 (WULFSBERG JENS PETER [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XDI] - BARADAT ET AL, "Design and prototyping of a new balancing mechanism for spatial parallel manipulators", JOURNAL OF MECHANICAL DESIGN,, (20080701), vol. 130, no. 7, pages 72305 - 1, XP009123750 [XD] 1 * the whole document * [I] 3 | [A] - HERDER J L, "Some considerations regarding Statically Balanced Parallel Mechanisms (SBPM's)", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WORKSHOP ON FUNDAMENTAL ISSUES AND FUTURERESEARCH DIRECTIONS FOR PARALLEL MECHANISMS AND MANIPULATORS, XX, XX, (20021003), pages 40 - 45, XP002332621 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | - C. BARADAT ET AL., JOURNAL OF MECHANICAL DESIGN, (200807), vol. 130 |