EP2406549 - RADIATOR FASTENING SYSTEM FOR HINGE SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | RADIATOR | ||
[2012/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.R.C.A. S.p.a. Industria Resistenze Corazzate e Affini Viale Venezia 31 31020 San Vendemiano / IT | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISENTIN, Simone Via L. Maronese 8-3 I-31025 Santa Lucia Di Piave / IT | 02 /
ARGENTON, Marco Via Verona 3/A I-30020 Cinto Caomaggiore / IT | 03 /
PRAVATO, Michele Via A. Aliprandi 20 I-31015 Conegliano / IT | 04 /
PETERLE, Michele Via Toscana 27 B I-31010 Mareno Di Piave / IT | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2012/03] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10719064.7 | 10.03.2010 | WO2010IB00507 | Priority number, date | IT2009RM00107 | 10.03.2009 Original published format: IT RM20090107 | [2012/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010103385 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2406549 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406549 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/02, F24D19/06, A47K10/06, F28F1/20, F28F1/22 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
F28F1/20 (EP,US);
A47K10/06 (EP,US);
F24D19/02 (EP,US);
F24D19/0209 (EP,US);
F24D19/0283 (EP,US);
F24D19/0293 (EP,US);
F28F1/22 (EP,US);
F24D2220/2054 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0035 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0036 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWENKBARE HEIZKÖRPERHALTERUNG | [2012/41] | English: | RADIATOR FASTENING SYSTEM FOR HINGE SUPPORT | [2012/41] | French: | SUPPORT PIVOTABLE POUR RADIATEUR | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/03] | HEIZKÖRPER | ||
Former [2012/03] | RADIATOR | ||
Former [2012/03] | RADIATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 30.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2010 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | ES | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | HR | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MK | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | SM | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | IE | 10.03.2014 | LU | 10.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | NO | 15.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | DE | 01.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
DE | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 10.03.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1801886U (LEIBER EGWIN [DE]) [A] 10-13 * pages 1-3; figures 1-5 *; | [YA]GB2148097 (WELLS JOHN CHARLES) [Y] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 6; | [A]WO8806260 (HYDROTHERM AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 10-13 * pages 4-8; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE4129299 (SIGARTH AB [SE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH07248196 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 14-17 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0733867 (GIACOMINI SERVICES AND ENGINEE [CH]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document * [Y] 5,10-13; | [X]DE19548255 (HEUEL WILHELM [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29805991U (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * pages 10-11; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE202004004285U (SIEGENIA AUBI KG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE202004008946U (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1686340 (TECNOGIM DI GIACINTO BASSANI [IT]) [Y] 10-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1754943 (CALORIGEN USA CORP [US]) [A] 14-17 * paragraph [0082]; figure 10 *; | [XA]GB2446465 (MONTHY ALLEN JALAL [GB]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * pages 4-5; figures 1,2 * [A] 5,6; | [A]DE202008010425U (HANSGROHE AG [DE]) [A] 14-17* the whole document * |