EP2414758 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REFRIGERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/06] | REFRIGERATION GENERATION METHOD AND SYSTEM | ||
[2016/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praxair Technology, Inc. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2016/50] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Praxair Technology, Inc. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAUCH, Jeremiah, James 7655 Goodrich Road Clarence Center NY 14032 / US | 02 /
BAKER, Robert, Leroy 139 Brompton Road Williamsville NY 14221 / US | 03 /
O'CONNOR, Gerald, T. 561 Mill Road West Seneca NY 14224 / US | 04 /
STANKO, Michael, John 112 Trails End Grand Island NY 14072 / US | 05 /
CHINTA, Murali 2326 Whispering Pines Drive Toledo OH 43617 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2012/06] | 01 /
RAUCH, Jeremiah, James 7655 Goodrich Road Clarence Center NY 14032 / US | ||
02 /
BAKER, Robert, Leroy 139 Brompton Road Williamsville NY 14221 / US | |||
03 /
O'CONNOR, Gerald, T. 561 Mill Road West Seneca NY 14224 / US | |||
04 /
STANKO, Michael, John 112 Trails End Grand Island NY 14072 / US | |||
05 /
CHINTA, Murali 4312 N. Holland Sylvania Road 120 Toledo OH 43623 / US | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10719662.8 | 19.03.2010 | [2016/50] | WO2010US27974 | Priority number, date | US20090418056 | 03.04.2009 Original published format: US 418056 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010114719 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2414758 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2414758 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
F25J3/04866 (EP,US);
F25J3/0409 (EP,US);
F25J3/04296 (EP,US);
F25J3/04387 (EP,US);
F25J3/04412 (EP,US);
F25J3/04781 (EP,US);
F25J2240/10 (EP,US);
F25J2240/30 (EP,US);
F25J2240/42 (EP,US);
F25J2280/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KÄLTEERZEUGUNG | [2016/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REFRIGERATION | [2016/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE FROID | [2016/49] |
Former [2012/06] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TIEFTEMPERATURVERFLÜSSIGUNG | ||
Former [2012/06] | REFRIGERATION GENERATION METHOD AND SYSTEM | ||
Former [2012/06] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 23.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2010 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | GB | 19.03.2017 | IE | 19.03.2017 | LU | 19.03.2017 | MT | 19.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
GB | 19.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.03.2017 | ||
LU | 19.03.2017 | ||
MT | 19.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
GB | 19.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.03.2017 | ||
LU | 19.03.2017 | ||
MT | 19.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.03.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
GB | 19.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.03.2017 | ||
LU | 19.03.2017 | ||
MT | 19.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
GB | 19.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.03.2017 | ||
LU | 19.03.2017 | ||
MT | 19.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
GB | 19.03.2017 | ||
IE | 19.03.2017 | ||
LU | 19.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 19.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5758515 (HOWARD HENRY EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 66 - line 7; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0880000 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 19; figure 4 *; | [A]US6382910 (KATO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, lines 42-48; figure 7 * * column 6, lines 29-57 *; | [A]US7278818 (BOSEN WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, lines 23-26; claim 1 *; | [A]US2008216511 (HOWARD HENRY EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0046]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1975375 (IHI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0013] , [0023]; figure 1 * |