EP2432769 - N-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINYL OR HOMOPIPERAZINYL)-BENZENESULFONAMIDE OR BENZENESULFONYL-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINE OR HOMOPIPERAZINE) COMPOUNDS SUITABLE FOR TREATING DISORDERS THAT RESPOND TO MODULATION OF THE SEROTONIN 5-HT6 RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/13] | N-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINYL OR HOMOPIPERAZINYL)-BENZENESULFONAMIDE OR BENZENESULFONYL-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINE OR HOMOPIPERAZINE) COMPOUNDS SUITABLE FOR TREATING DISORDERS THAT RESPOND TO MODULATION OF THE SEROTONIN 5-HT6 RECEPTOR& xA; | ||
[2014/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co KG Max-Planck-Ring 2a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | For all designated states AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
For all designated states AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | |||
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUPT, Andreas AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
POHLKI, Frauke AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
DRESCHER, Karla AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
WICKE, Karsten AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
UNGER, Liliane AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
RELO, Ana-Lucia AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07 /
BESPALOV, Anton AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08 /
VOGG, Barbara AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 09 /
BACKFISCH, Gisela AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 10 /
DELZER, Juergen AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Knollstrasse 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 11 /
ZHANG, Min AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegen Road North Chicago Illinois 60064 / US | 12 /
LAO, Yanbin AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegen Road North Chicago Illinois 60064 / US | [2014/35] |
Former [2012/13] | 01 /
HAUPT, Andreas Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02 /
POHLKI, Frauke Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
DRESCHER, Karla Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
04 /
WICKE, Karsten Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
05 /
UNGER, Liliane Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
06 /
RELO, Ana-Lucia Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
07 /
BESPALOV, Anton Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
08 /
VOGG, Barbara Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
09 /
BACKFISCH, Gisela Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
10 /
DELZER, Juergen Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
11 /
ZHANG, Min Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064-6050 / US | |||
12 /
LAO, Yanbin Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064-6050 / US | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2015/14] |
Former [2012/13] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10719748.5 | 29.04.2010 | WO2010EP55789 | Priority number, date | US20090174054P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174054 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010125134 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432769 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2432769 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/04, C07D317/06, C07D295/096, A61K31/495, A61P25/18, A61P25/28, A61P25/30 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
C07D295/096 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | RS | 28.11.2011 | Title | German: | N-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINYL- ODER HOMOPIPERAZINYL)-BENZOLSULFONAMID- ODER BENZOLSULFONYL-PHENYL-(PIPERAZIN- ODER HOMOPIPERAZIN) -VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUF SEROTONIN-5-HT6-REZEPTORMODULATION ANSPRECHENDEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2012/13] | English: | N-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINYL OR HOMOPIPERAZINYL)-BENZENESULFONAMIDE OR BENZENESULFONYL-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINE OR HOMOPIPERAZINE) COMPOUNDS SUITABLE FOR TREATING DISORDERS THAT RESPOND TO MODULATION OF THE SEROTONIN 5-HT6 RECEPTOR | [2014/43] | French: | COMPOSÉS N-PHÉNYL-(PIPÉRAZINYL OU HOMOPIPÉRAZINYL)- BENZÈNESULFONAMIDE OU BENZÈNESULFONYL-PHÉNYL-(PIPÉRAZINE OU HOMOPIPÉRAZINE) ADAPTÉS AU TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES RÉPONDANT À LA MODULATION DU RÉCEPTEUR 5-HT6 DE LA SÉROTONINE | [2012/13] |
Former [2012/13] | N-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINYL OR HOMOPIPERAZINYL)-BENZENESULFONAMIDE OR BENZENESULFONYL-PHENYL-(PIPERAZINE OR HOMOPIPERAZINE) COMPOUNDS SUITABLE FOR TREATING DISORDERS THAT RESPOND TO MODULATION OF THE SEROTONIN 5-HT6 RECEPTOR& xA; | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 13.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2010 | AT | 01.04.2015 | BE | 01.04.2015 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MK | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | SM | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | IE | 29.04.2015 | LU | 29.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | NO | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 29.04.2010 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LU | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 29.04.2010 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO9902502 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [ID] 1-37 * claims 1,8,10 * * page 10, lines 27-35 *; | [I]US2003069254 (BERGER JACOB [US], et al) [I] 1-37* claims 1,21,24 * | by applicant | - A. MENESES, DRUG NEWS PERSPECT, (2001), vol. 14, no. 7, pages 396 - 400 | - J. PHARMACOL. SCI., (2006), vol. 101, no. 1, page 124 | - EUROPEAN J. ORG. CHEM., (2002), pages 2094 - 2108 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2001), vol. 57, no. 27, pages 5885 - 5895 | - BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 10, no. 8, pages 835 - 838 | - SYNTHESIS, (2000), pages 103 - 108 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2000), vol. 56, no. 38, pages 7553 - 7560 | - SYNLETT., (2000), pages 475 - 480 | - ONO ET AL., CHEM. IND. (LONDON), (1983), page 480 | - LALANCETTE ET AL., CAN. J. CHEM., (1971), vol. 49, page 2990 | - BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2002), vol. 12, no. 15, pages 1917 - 1919 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, no. 21, pages 4679 - 4688 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2001), vol. 57, pages 9199 - 9225 | - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1980), vol. 107, pages 220 - 239 | - MUNSON; RODBARD, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, pages 220 - 239 | - FELDMAN, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1972), vol. 48, pages 317 - 338 | - CHENG; PRUSOFF, BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1973), vol. 22, pages 2099 - 2108 |