Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2401253 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP10719784 EP12162558 IN2010000045W



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010097802Global Dossier 23.12.2010A3
WO2010097802 02.09.2010A2
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2479166Global Dossier 20.08.2014B1
EP2479166 25.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP10719784 25.01.2010
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2401253Global Dossier 13.01.2016B1
EP2401253 04.01.2012A2
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
WO2010IN00045 25.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR075441 30.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI1006374 24.09.2019A2
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
WO2010IN00045 25.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2401253T 18.04.2016T3
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
WO2010IN00045 25.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2479166T 01.09.2014T3
Priority number Date
EP10719784 25.01.2010
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2496465T 19.09.2014T3
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2562981T 09.03.2016T3
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
WO2010IN00045 25.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HUE028730T 30.01.2017T2
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MY163020 31.07.2017A
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2401253T 31.05.2016T3
Priority number Date
EP10719784 25.01.2010
IN441MU2009 
WO2010IN00045 25.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2479166T 28.11.2014T3
Priority number Date
EP10719784 25.01.2010
EP12162558 25.01.2010
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT2479166E 28.11.2014E
Priority number Date
IN441MU2009 
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2479166