EP2382153 - METHOD, DEVICE AND FUEL FOR HYDROGEN GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H2Fuel-Systems B.V. House of Vision Rouwkooplaan 5 2251 AP Voorschoten / NL | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUGTIGHEID, Gerardus, Wilhelmus Dilledonk Noord 23 NL-3206 BW Spijkenisse / NL | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2011/44] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10720205.3 | 27.01.2010 | WO2010NL00014 | Priority number, date | NL20091036471 | 27.01.2009 Original published format: NL 1036471 | NL20091037461 | 11.11.2009 Original published format: NL 1037461 | NL20101037618 | 11.01.2010 Original published format: NL 1037618 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010087698 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2382153 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/06 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
C01B3/065 (EP,CN,US);
C01B3/06 (CN,EA);
B60K15/03 (EA);
B60S5/02 (EA);
B67D7/04 (US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND BRENNSTOFF FÜR WASSERSTOFFPRODUKTION | [2011/44] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND FUEL FOR HYDROGEN GENERATION | [2011/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET CARBURANT UTILISABLES À DES FINS DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROGÈNE | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 01.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP21212636.1 / EP3984947 | EP21212638.7 / EP3984948 | EP21212640.3 / EP3984949 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3346506 (BEUMEL JR OSCAR FRANCIS) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0185606 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [A] 16* claim - *; | [XI]WO02066369 (SAFE HYDROGEN LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10,13-16,19,24-29,31,32 * the whole document * [I] 1-47; | [A]EP1375419 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 34 * figure 7 *; | [XI] - MCCLAINE A W; ET AL, "Hydrogen Transmission/Storage with metal hydride-organic slurry and advanced chemical hydrides/hydrogen for PEMFC vehicles", PROCEEDINGS OF DOE HYDROGEN PROGRAM REVIEW, XX, XX, (20000509), pages 1 - 14, XP002365768 [X] 41,42,45-47 * the whole document * [I] 1-47 | [XI] - BREAULT R W; ROLFE J; MCCLAINE A, "HYDROGEN TRANSMISSION/STORAGE WITH A CHEMICAL HYDRIDE/ORGANIC SLURRY", PROCEEDINGS OF CANADIAN HYDROGEN CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (19990101), vol. SESSION 06, no. 5, pages 393 - 402, XP009061089 [X] 41,42,45-47 * the whole document * [I] 1-47 | [A] - ULLMANN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY, Weinheim, Wiley_VCH Verlag, (2005), XP002588641 [A] 23,40 * page 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.A26_621 |