EP2430501 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF COMMUNICATION FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool S.A. Av. Nações Unidas n°12.995 32° andar Brooklin Novo São Paulo - SP 04578-000 / BR | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Marcos Guilherme Rua Ex-Combatentes 125 89221-103 - Joinville - SC / BR | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10720524.7 | 12.05.2010 | WO2010BR00152 | Priority number, date | BR2009PI01496 | 15.05.2009 Original published format: BR PI0901496 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010130018 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430501 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430501 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G05B19/0425 (EP,KR,US);
G05B2219/21155 (EP,KR,US);
G05B2219/25314 (EP,KR,US);
G05B2219/2613 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE GERÄTE | [2012/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF COMMUNICATION FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUSES | [2012/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION POUR APPAREILS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2012/12] |
Former [2012/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF COMMUNICATION FOR ELECTRONIC APPARATUSES | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 15.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2010 | AL | 17.04.2013 | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | HR | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | MK | 17.04.2013 | MT | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | SM | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | IE | 12.05.2013 | LU | 12.05.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AT | 17.04.2013 | ||
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MK | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
LU | 12.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AT | 17.04.2013 | ||
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MK | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
LU | 12.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MK | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
SM | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
HR | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
NO | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2005106359 (BRASIL COMPRESSORES SA [BR]; DUARTE RONALDO RIBEIRO [BR]; SCHWARZ MARC) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001038329 (DIAMANTI PAOLO [CA] ET AL) [A] 1,5,8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0053] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004156159 (LIEBENOW FRANK [US]) [A] 1,5,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009115583 (CHEN GANG [NZ]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |