EP2433138 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A WOUND INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigl, Eva Brunnalmstraße 12 8664 Groß Veitsch / AT | [2017/37] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states Technische Universität Graz Rechbauerstraße 12 8010 Graz / AT | ||
For all designated states Forschungsholding TU Graz GmbH Rechbauerstraße 12 8010 Graz / AT | |||
For all designated states Medizinische Universität Graz Auenbruggerplatz 2 8036 Graz / AT | |||
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Technische Universität Graz Rechbauerstraße 12 8010 Graz / AT | ||
For all designated states Forschungsholding TU Graz GmbH Rechbauerstraße 12 8010 Graz / AT | |||
For all designated states Medizinische Universität Graz Universitätsplatz 3 8010 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÜBITZ, Georg Hans Klöpfer-Gasse 21 A-8047 Hart bei Graz / AT | 02 /
WEHRSCHÜTZ-SIGL, Eva Korösistrasse 63L A-8010 Graz / AT | 03 /
HASMANN, Andrea Sandgasse 41/4/42 A-8010 Graz / AT | 04 /
BINDER, Barbara Rungeweg 5/6 A-8010 Graz / AT | 05 /
BURNETT, Michael Paul Ehrlich Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | 06 /
SCHINTLER, Michael Stiftigtalstrasse 48 A-8010 Graz / AT | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2012/13] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 10720771.4 | 18.05.2010 | [2016/37] | WO2010EP56811 | Priority number, date | EP20090160557 | 18.05.2009 Original published format: EP 09160557 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010133589 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2433138 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2433138 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, C12Q1/28, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/37 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
G01N33/528 (EP,US);
G01N21/78 (US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2333/908 (EP,US);
G01N2333/924 (EP,US);
G01N2333/96433 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | G01N33/68, G01N33/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER WUNDINFEKTION | [2012/13] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING A WOUND INFECTION | [2012/13] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR DÉTECTER UNE INFECTION DE BLESSURE | [2015/48] |
Former [2012/13] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE L'INFECTION D'UNE PLAIE | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 05.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | MC | 14.09.2016 | |
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | SM | 14.09.2016 | |
IS | 14.01.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0864864 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-13 * example 1; claims 1-20 *; | [X]GB2381452 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 1 - line 31; claims 1-7 * * page 6, line 6 - line 29 *; | [A]GB2418145 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-13* claims 1-18 *; | [A]GB2426335 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-17 *; | [Y] - CHOI DONG-KUG ET AL, Ablation of the inflammatory enzyme myeloperoxidase mitigates features of Parkinson's disease in mice, JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, VOL. 25, NR. 28, PAGE(S) 6594-6600, (200507), ISSN 0270-6474, XP002596179 [Y] 1-13 * page 6595, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.0970-05-2005 | Examination | WO0230478 |