EP2432699 - A METHOD FOR PRINTING WATER-SOLUBLE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2021/33] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONTENT, Stephane Rue Joseph Wauters 84 B-1030 Brussels / BE | 02 /
DENOME, Frank, William 6234 Elmhill Court Cincinnati Ohio 45248 / US | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Pickford, James Lawrence Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton GB-Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2013/38] | Pickford, James Lawrence Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2012/13] | Goodier, Claire-Louise N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 10720971.0 | 17.05.2010 | [2021/33] | WO2010US35108 | Priority number, date | US20090179390P | 19.05.2009 Original published format: US 179390 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010135238 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432699 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2432699 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B61/02, B41M1/04, B41M1/30, C11D17/04 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
C11D17/042 (EP);
B41F5/24 (US);
B41M1/04 (EP,US);
B41M1/30 (EP,US);
B65B1/00 (US);
B65B43/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEDRUCKEN VON WASSERLÖSLICHER FOLIE | [2012/13] | English: | A METHOD FOR PRINTING WATER-SOLUBLE FILM | [2012/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION D'UN FILM SOLUBLE DANS L'EAU | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 25.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2012 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 14.11.2012 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 23.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.02.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 18.03.2016 | Appeal received No. T1828/16 | 24.06.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.04.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | EP12173508.8 / EP2508436 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2010 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | IT | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | IE | 17.05.2022 | LU | 17.05.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2022 | ||
LU | 17.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2022 | ||
LU | 17.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2022 | ||
LU | 17.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.05.2022 | ||
LU | 17.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [IDY]US5666785 (JOUFFREAU CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [ID] 1-12 * the whole document * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]US2006000540 (MATHEA HANS [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0035]; claims 1-6 * | Examination | US2003056667 | WO0240351 | EP1504994 |