EP2532079 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING CURRENTS IN A BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSEL, Jörg Birkenweg 25 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
MICHAELIS, Gerd Auf der Höh 4 91096 Möhrendorf / DE | 03 /
PROBOL, Carsten Eisenstrasse 21 91054 Buckenhof / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 10721693.9 | 11.05.2010 | WO2010EP02905 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011141038 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2532079 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00, G01R31/34 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
G01R31/343 (EP,US);
G06V40/1306 (US);
G01R27/2605 (US);
H02K11/20 (EP,US);
H02K2211/03 (EP,US);
H02K5/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON STRÖMEN IN EINEM LAGER | [2012/50] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING CURRENTS IN A BEARING | [2012/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE COURANTS DANS UN PALIER | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 27.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/11] | 27.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3176286 (YUAN-HENG DSCHEN) [A] 1,11* the whole document *; | [A]US3506912 (BRAUN ROBERT) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [I]DE102008035613 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1,3,8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 1,6 * |