EP2410986 - CALCIUM CITRATE AND CALCIUM LACTATE FORMULATIONS FOR ALTERATION OF BIOPHYSICAL PROPERTIES OF MUCOSAL LINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulmatrix, Inc. 99 Hayden Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Robert W. 60 Kings Road Canton Massachusetts 02021 / US | 02 /
BATYCKY, Richard 19 Bernard Street Newton Massachusetts 02461 / US | 03 /
HAVA, David L. 68 S. Main Street, 2 Natick Massachusetts 01760 / US | 04 /
LIPP, Michael M. 45A Flanagan Drive Framingham Massachusetts 01701 / US | 05 /
SUNG, Jean C. 259 Putnam Avenue Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10722835.5 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010US28914 | Priority number, date | US20090163772P | 26.03.2009 Original published format: US 163772 P | US20090267747P | 08.12.2009 Original published format: US 267747 P | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010111650 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2410986 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K47/02, A61K47/12, A61K31/04, A61K31/14, A61K31/16 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K31/04 (KR);
A61K31/14 (KR);
A61K31/16 (KR);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K9/0078 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | CALCIUMCITRAT- UND CALCIUMLACTAT-FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER BIOPHYSIKALISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN DER SCHLEIMHAUT | [2012/05] | English: | CALCIUM CITRATE AND CALCIUM LACTATE FORMULATIONS FOR ALTERATION OF BIOPHYSICAL PROPERTIES OF MUCOSAL LINING | [2012/05] | French: | FORMULATIONS À BASE DE CITRATE DE CALCIUM ET DE LACTATE DE CALCIUM DESTINÉES À MODIFIER LES PROPRIÉTÉS BIOPHYSIQUES DES MUQUEUSES | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 24.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 30.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0681833 (DOTT RESEARCH LAB [JP]) [X] 1,16,18-20,22-24 * page 23; example 11; claim 4 * [A] 2-15,17,21,25-32; | [XA]EP1466610 (DAIICHI SUNTORY PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,16-18,20-24 * claims 5,7 * [A] 2-15,19,25-32; | [A]WO2005084638 (PULMATRIX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 10 ** page 11, line 27 - page 14, line 20; table 1 *; | [XA]US2005255049 (SLOWEY ALEXANDER D [GB], et al) [X] 1,16,18,20,22-24 * claim 8 * [A] 2-15,17,19,25-32; | [I]WO2006125153 (PULMATRIX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-32 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 20 * * page 10, lines 11-30 * * page 11, lines 17-26 * * page 12, lines 16-27 * * page 13, line 28 - page 22, line 30; examples 1-5; claims 1-21; tables 1,2 * * page 15, lines 20-29 * * page 16, lines 24-32 * * page 18, lines 1-9 * * page 21, line 1 - page 22, line 3 * * page 26, lines 11-14 * * page 27, lines 8-17 * | by applicant | - VISSER, J., POWDER TECHNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 58, pages 1 - 10 | - RUDT, S.; R. H. MULLER., L. CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1992), vol. 22, pages 263 - 272 | - TABATA Y.; Y. IKADA, J. BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1988), vol. 22, pages 837 - 858 | - GANDERTON D., J. BIOPHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1992), vol. 3, pages 101 - 105 | - FRENCH, D. L.; EDWARDS, D. A.; NIVEN, R. W., J. AEROSOL SCI., (1996), vol. 27, pages 769 - 783 | - GROTH, THORAX, (1988), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 360 - 365 |