EP2432883 - EUKARYOTIC HOST CELL COMPRISING AN EXPRESSION ENHANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FH Campus Wien Favoritenstrasse 226 1100 Vienna / AT | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STADLMAYR, Gerhard Sonnleithnerg. 17/4/23 A-1100 Vienna / AT | 02 /
MATTANOVICH, Diethard Ignazg. 7/3 A-1120 Vienna / AT | 03 /
SAUER, Michael Blechturmg. 28/12 A-1040 Vienna / AT | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Redl, Gerda, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Donau-City-Strasse 11 1220 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Redl, Gerda, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Tech Gate Vienna Donau-City-Strasse 1 1220 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 10723065.8 | 20.05.2010 | WO2010EP56967 | Priority number, date | EP20090160750 | 20.05.2009 Original published format: EP 09160750 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010133668 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2432883 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/67 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
C12N15/815 (EP,US);
C12N1/18 (KR);
C12N15/67 (KR);
C12N15/81 (KR);
C12N5/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | EUKARYONTISCHE WIRTSZELLE MIT EINEM EXPRESSIONSVERBESSERER | [2012/13] | English: | EUKARYOTIC HOST CELL COMPRISING AN EXPRESSION ENHANCER | [2012/13] | French: | CELLULE HÔTE EUCARYOTE COMPRENANT UN ACTIVATEUR D'EXPRESSION | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - GASSER BRIGITTE ET AL, "Transcriptomics-based identification of novel factors enhancing heterologous protein secretion in Yeasts", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20071001), vol. 73, no. 20, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 6499 - 6507, XP002499993 [X] 1-16 *Whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.01196-07 | [AD] - PORRO DANILO ET AL, "Recombinant protein production in yeasts", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200511), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 245 - 259, XP002557596 [AD] 1-16 *Whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/MB:31:3:245 | [A] - DALY R ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF HETEROLOGOUS PROTEINS IN PICHIA PASTORIS: A USEFUL EXPERIMENTAL TOOL IN PROTEIN ENGINEERING AND PRODUCTION", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR RECOGNITION, HEYDEN & SON LTD., LONDON, GB, (20050301), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 0952-3499, pages 119 - 138, XP009059265 [A] 1-16 *Whole document* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jmr.687 | by applicant | WO2008128701 | WO9325676 | WO9408012 | WO03057897 | WO2005067818 | WO2006067511 | WO0172783 | - WENTZ; SHUSTA, APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2007), vol. 73, no. 4, pages 1189 - 1198 | - ARCHER, D.; JEENES, D.; MACKENZIE, D., "Strategies for improving heterologous protein production from filamentous fungi", ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, (1994), vol. 65, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00871952, pages 245 - 50, XP000943720 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00871952 | - GETHING, M.; SAMBROOK, J., "Protein folding in the cell", NATURE, (1992), vol. 355, doi:doi:10.1038/355033a0, pages 33 - 45, XP002060491 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/355033a0 | - HOHENBLUM, H. ET AL., "Assessing viability and cell-associated product of recombinant protein producing Pichia pastoris with flow cytometry", J BIOTECHNOL, (2003), vol. 102, pages 281 - 290 | - KURTZMAN CP., "Description of Komagataella phaffii sp. nov. and the transfer of Pichia pseudopastoris to the methylotrophic yeast genus Komagataella", INT J SYST EVOL MICROBIOL, (2005), vol. 55, pages 973 - 976, XP002610732 | - LANG, C.; LOOMAN, A., "Efficient expression and secretion of Aspergillus niger RH5344 polygalacturonase in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL, (1995), vol. 44, pages 147 - 56, XP001005274 | - MACAULEY-PATRICK, S.; FAZENDA, M. L.; MCNEIL, B.; HARVEY, L. M., "Heterologous protein production using the Pichia pastoris expression system", YEAST, (2005), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1002/yea.1208, pages 249 - 70, XP002474659 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.1208 | - MATTANOVICH, D.; GASSER, B.; HOHENBLUM, H.; SAUER, M., "Stress in recombinant protein producing yeasts", J BIOTECHNOL, (2004), vol. 113, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jbiotec.2004.04.035, pages 121 - 35, XP004569604 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2004.04.035 | - MORI, K.; OGAWA, N.; KAWAHARA, T.; YANAGI, H.; YURA, T., "mRNA splicing-mediated C-terminal replacement of transcription factor Hac1 p is required for efficient activation of the unfolded protein response", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2000), vol. 97, pages 4660 - 5 | - PORRO, D.; SAUER, M.; BRANDUARDI, P.; MATTANOVICH, D., "Recombinant protein production in yeasts", MOL BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 31, pages 245 - 59 | - PUNT, P. J.; VAN BIEZEN, N.; CONESA, A.; ALBERS, A.; MANGNUS, J.; HONDEL, C., "Filamentous fungi as cell factories for heterologous protein production", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1016/S0167-7799(02)01933-9, pages 200 - 6, XP004349665 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(02)01933-9 | - SAUER, M.; BRANDUARDI, P.; GASSER, B.; VALLI, M.; MAURER, M.; PORRO, D.; MATTANOVICH, D., "Differential gene expression in recombinant Pichia pastoris analysed by heterologous DNA microarray hybridisation", MICROB CELL FACT, (2004), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1186/1475-2859-3-17, page 17, XP021007190 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-3-17 | - SHUSTER, J., "Gene expression in yeast: protein secretion", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1991), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0958-1669(91)90035-4, pages 685 - 90, XP023601390 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0958-1669(91)90035-4 | - LONGTINE, M. S.; A. MCKENZIE, 3RD; D. J. DEMARINI; N. G. SHAH; A. WACH ET AL., "Additional modules for versatile and economical PCR-based gene deletion and modification in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", YEAST, (1998), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0061(199807)14:10<953::AID-YEA293>3.0.CO;2-U, pages 953 - 961, XP002668011 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0061(199807)14:10<953::AID-YEA293>3.0.CO;2-U | - HOHENBLUM H; GASSER B; MAURER M; BORTH N; MATTANOVICH D, "Effects of Gene Dosage, Promoters, and Substrates on Unfolded Protein Stress of Recombinant Pichia pastoris", BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (20040220), vol. 85, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1002/bit.10904, pages 367 - 75, XP009118820 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10904 | - GASSER, B.; MAURER, M.; GACH, J.; KUNERT, R.; MATTANOVICH, D., "Engineering of Pichia pastoris for improved production of antibody fragments", BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2006), vol. 94, doi:doi:10.1002/bit.20851, pages 353 - 61, XP008101654 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20851 |