EP2419129 - COMPOSITIONS FOR IMMUNISING AGAINST STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/08] | COMPOSITIONS FOR IMMUNISING AGAINST STAPHYLOCOCCUS AERUS | ||
[2017/14] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut, 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2017/24] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAGNOLI, Fabio Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
BIAGINI, Massimilliano Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 03 /
FIASCHI, Luigi Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 04 /
GRANDI, Guido Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 05 /
MISHRA, Ravi Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 06 /
NORAIS, Nathalie Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 07 /
SCARSELLI, Maria Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Sampson, Catherine GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents CN925.1 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10723299.3 | 14.04.2010 | WO2010IB00998 | Priority number, date | US20090212705P | 14.04.2009 Original published format: US 212705 P | US20090234079P | 14.08.2009 Original published format: US 234079 P | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010119343 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2419129 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/085, C07K14/31, A61K39/00 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
A61K39/085 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (KR);
A61K39/39533 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP,KR);
A61P37/04 (EP,KR);
C07K14/31 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | A61K39/085, C07K14/31 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR IMMUNISIERUNG GEGEN STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2017/14] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR IMMUNISING AGAINST STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2017/14] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR L'IMMUNISATION CONTRE STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2012/08] |
Former [2012/08] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR IMMUNISIERUNG GEGEN STAPHYLOCOCCUS AERUS | ||
Former [2012/08] | COMPOSITIONS FOR IMMUNISING AGAINST STAPHYLOCOCCUS AERUS | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 01.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/05] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/05] | Divisional application(s) | EP12175868.4 / EP2510947 | EP17181927.9 / EP3263128 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO02094868 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al); | [A]WO03020875 (SQUARED BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC D [US], et al); | [XI]WO2008019162 (UNIV CHICAGO [US], et al); |