EP2429326 - ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR WITH VERTICAL GROOVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Nike International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLANNERY, William J. c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | 02 /
KRIWET, Andre c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2017/20] |
Former [2012/12] | 01 /
FLANNERY, William J. c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton OR 97005-6453 / US | ||
02 /
KRIWET, Andre c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton OR 97005-6453 / US | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2017/20] |
Former [2012/12] | Liska, Horst Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10723441.1 | 22.04.2010 | [2017/20] | WO2010US32005 | Priority number, date | US20090430561 | 27.04.2009 Original published format: US 430561 | US20090613280 | 05.11.2009 Original published format: US 613280 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010129182 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2429326 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2429326 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/12, A43B13/14, A43B13/18 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
A43B13/141 (EP,US);
A43B13/125 (EP,US);
A43B13/181 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/12] | A43B13/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHWERK MIT SENKRECHTEN RILLEN | [2016/48] | English: | ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR WITH VERTICAL GROOVES | [2012/12] | French: | CHAUSSURE AVEC RAINURES VERTICALES | [2016/48] |
Former [2012/12] | FUSSBEKLEIDUNGSARTIKEL MIT VERTIKALEN RILLEN | ||
Former [2012/12] | ARTICLE CHAUSSANT AVEC RAINURES VERTICALES | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 04.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17171003.1 / EP3231309 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2010 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.04.2010 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006042120 (SOKOLOWSKI SUSAN L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,14,15,17-22 * figures 2, 5, 9, 12 *; | [X]JP2000197503 (ASICS CORP) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-22 * figures 1, 3-4 *; | [X]EP1844673 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,12-14,16-20,22 * figures 1-2, 7, 10, 16-17 *; | [XA]WO9618317 (ADIDAS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 2-3 * [A] 7,14; | [XA]US2004148803 (GROVE JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 3-4, 6-7 * [A] 7,14; | [XA]CN201182253Y (GUOHUI CHINA CO LTD [CN]) [X] 7,8,12-14,16-22 * figure - * [A] 1; | [XA]EP1787540 (DC SHOES INC [US]) [X] 7-22 * figure - * [A] 1; | [XA]US2005257405 (KILGORE BRUCE J [US]) [X] 7,8,12,14,16-22 * figures 1-2, 6, 9 * [A] 1; | [XA]US2006213083 (NISHIWAKI TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 7-10,12-22 * figures 8a, 9 * [A] 1 | by applicant | US6108943 |