EP2445329 - SOIL WORKING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/18] | SOIL TREATING TOOL | ||
[2015/26] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | 29.10.2021 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Betek GmbH & Co. KG Sulgener Strasse 21-23 78733 Aichhalden / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states BETEK Bergbau- und Hartmetalltechnik Karl-Heinz Simon GmbH & Co. KG Sulgener Strasse 19-23 78733 Aichhalden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAEMER, Ulrich Leubach 6 77709 Wolfach / DE | 02 /
SMEETS, Florian Baiersbronner Str. 57 72270 Baiersbronn / DE | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen, et al Herrmann Patentanwälte Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, et al Jeck Fleck Herrmann Patentanwälte Postfach 14 69 71657 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, et al Jeck Fleck Herrmann Patentanwälte Postfach 14 69 71657 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 10723577.2 | 28.05.2010 | [2015/34] | WO2010EP57392 | Priority number, date | DE20091029894 | 23.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009029894 | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010149464 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2445329 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2445329 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01B15/06 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A01B15/06 (EP,US);
A01B15/04 (EP);
A01B15/18 (EP);
A01B35/225 (EP);
A47B91/04 (EP);
A47B91/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENBEARBEITUNGSWERKZEUG | [2012/18] | English: | SOIL WORKING TOOL | [2015/26] | French: | OUTIL DE TRAVAIL DU SOL | [2015/26] |
Former [2012/18] | SOIL TREATING TOOL | ||
Former [2012/18] | OUTIL POUR LE TRAVAIL DU SOL | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 27.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.11.2015 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | EP15175618.6 / EP2959757 | EP17189648.3 / EP3289845 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2016
19.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE Horsch Maschinen GmbH Sitzenhof 1 92421 Schwandorf / DE Opponent's representative Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | 02
19.05.2016
24.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen-Gaste / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | 03
19.05.2016
24.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE Lemken GmbH & Co. KG Weseler Strasse 5 46519 Alpen / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/33] |
Former [2016/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2016
19.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE Horsch Maschinen GmbH Sitzenhof 1 92421 Schwandorf / DE Opponent's representative Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
02
19.05.2016
24.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen-Gaste / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
03
19.05.2016
24.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE Lemken GmbH & Co. KG Weseler Strasse 5 46519 Alpen / DE | |||
Former [2016/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2016
19.05.2016
ADMISSIBLE Horsch Maschinen GmbH Sitzenhof 1 92421 Schwandorf / DE Opponent's representative Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | 27.06.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.01.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.08.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/48] | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 11.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T0773/18 | 12.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.08.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 22.03.2018 | Appeal received No. T0773/18 | 10.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.08.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 23.04.2018 | Appeal received No. T0773/18 | 27.06.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.08.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 24.08.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2655792 (STEGHERR RUDOLF DIPL ING) [X] 1-6,9-13 * pages 2-4; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO2008000989 (KUHN HUARD SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-9,13* page 13; figures 6-7 * | Opposition | US4068594 | DE2655792 | US4132181 | US4363364 | DE8303393U | DE3223376 | US4529042 | GB2154413 | US4625810 | US4645013 | US5261763 | EP0923851 | DE19821377 | EP1143782 | EP1329555 | DE102004034093 | US2006231275 | WO2008000989 | DE1969592U | US3581664 | WO8204375 | DE3223376 | DE3329009 | FR2617669 | DE9404703U | DE19639862 | DE29722411U | JP2002300816 | EP1329555 | EP1346621 | JP2008081986 | FR2617669 | - Bargel, Hans-Jurgen, Werkstoffkunde, Bargel/Schulze, Düsseldorf, page 278, XP055289653 | - "Catalogue 2007", AgriCarb L'origine du carbure agricole, (20070000), pages FP - 19, XP055289659 | - "Der Hartmetall-Spezialist für die Landwirtschaft", Prospekt Agricarb, (20070000), pages 1 - 2, XP055289662 | - "Produktkatalog "TungStuds" - ,,Werkzeuge für echte Helden"", Werkzeuge für echte Helden, Firma Betek GmbH & Co. KG, pages 1 - 20, URL: http://www.betek.de/meta/downloads.html, XP055289677 | - HERRN RICHARD SAUERBECK, "Verschleißspitze kurze Version'' mit der Zeichnungsnummer 95063100 sowie ,,Verschleißspitze 3fach HM Test'' hervor", (20060000), XP055289685 |