EP2419587 - ANTI-THEFT DEVICE FOR COMMODITY ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thoonsen Trading 33 rue du Chardelièvre 36000 Chateauroux / FR | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOONSEN, Jacky 4 bis rue de Lieutenant Colonel Pichené F-36000 Chateauroux / FR | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Aupetit, Muriel J. C. Cabinet Wagret 6, Avenue Daniel Lesueur 75007 Paris / FR | [2016/01] |
Former [2012/08] | Aupetit, Muriel J. C. Cabinet Wagret 19, rue de Milan 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10723664.8 | 13.04.2010 | [2016/01] | WO2010FR50710 | Priority number, date | FR20090052442 | 14.04.2009 Original published format: FR 0952442 | [2012/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010119221 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2419587 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2419587 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E05B73/00, G08B13/24 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
E05B73/0017 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44444 (EP,US);
Y10T70/411 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIEBSTAHLSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINZELGÜTER | [2015/36] | English: | ANTI-THEFT DEVICE FOR COMMODITY ITEMS | [2012/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTIVOL POUR ARTICLES DE VENTE | [2012/08] |
Former [2012/08] | DIEBSTAHLSICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERKAUFSARTIKEL | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 25.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2010 | AT | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | MT | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IE | 13.04.2016 | LU | 13.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.04.2010 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IE | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IE | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3947930 (MARTENS HENRY J, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 3, paragraph 4 - column 7, paragraph 57; figures 1,8 *; | [X]US2003221464 (STROH HARALD [DE]) [X] 1-13 * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 18; figure 1 *; | [X]WO0235038 (ALPHA SECURITY PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5019801 (ANDERSON III PHILIP M [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-13; | [AD]FR2395553 (KNOGO CORP [US]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * |