EP2414602 - A SYSTEM FOR FIXING PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULA ON A COVERING COPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borrini, Marco Pietro Via Dante Alighieri 24 26034 Piadena (CR) / IT | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Mari, Marco Giovanni, et al Ing. Mari & C. S.r.l. Via Garibotti, 3 26100 Cremona / IT | [2012/06] | Application number, filing date | 10723763.8 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010IB00670 | Priority number, date | IT2009CR00009 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: IT CR20090009 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010113003 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2414602 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/18, H01L31/048 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP);
F24S25/33 (EP);
F24S25/615 (EP);
F24S40/44 (EP);
F24S2025/016 (EP);
F24S2025/801 (EP);
F24S40/80 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON FOTOVOLTAISCHEN MODULEN AUF EINER ABDECKUNG | [2012/06] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR FIXING PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULA ON A COVERING COPE | [2012/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION DE MODULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES SUR UN COURONNEMENT | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 15.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE202007005995U (IDEEMATIC DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0027] - [0037]; figures 1,3,4,6; claims 1,5,6 *; | [X]DE102005053639 (ULRICH SIEGFRIED [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0035] - [0050]; figures 1,3,4; claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE20209892U (MAEDER WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1,2,7 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2002146978 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,3,7,8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005155040 (BUREST KOGYO KENKYUSHO CO LTD) [A] 1,7-9 * abstract *; | [A]DE202008007838U (LEICHTMETALLBAU SCHLETTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007093421 (SCHWEIGER THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202007005995U | DE102005053639 |