EP2440587 - CATALYST FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Soperga, 14/A 20127 Milano / IT | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUSHIMI, Masaki Taunusstrasse 57 65760 Eschborn / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Martin Altenauer Str. 30 65239 Hochheim / DE | 03 /
MORINI, Giampiero Via Giotto 36 I-35100 Padova / IT | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Giberti, Stefano, et al c/o Basell Polioefine Italia s.r.l. Intellectual property dept. P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Giberti, Stefano, et al c/o Basell Polioefine Italia s.r.l. Intellectual property dept. P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 10724423.8 | 31.05.2010 | WO2010EP57527 | Priority number, date | EP20090162263 | 09.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09162263 | US20090268261P | 10.06.2009 Original published format: US 268261 P | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010142549 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2440587 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F4/646 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C08F10/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/6465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR ZUR OLEFINSPOLYMERISATION | [2014/32] | English: | CATALYST FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS | [2012/16] | French: | CATLYSEUR POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES | [2014/32] |
Former [2012/16] | KATALYSATOR FÜR DIE POLYMERISATION VON OLEFINEN | ||
Former [2012/16] | CATALYSEUR POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 25.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2512033 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * example 1 * * comparative example 1 * * example 6 * * comparative example 2 * * example 12 * * comparative example 4 * * example 17 * * abstract ** page 12, line 8 - page 13, line 4 * |