Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010143151 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2011 | A3 | WO2010143151 | 16.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8810328 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2014 | B2 | US2012112845 | 10.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03461 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8471547 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2013 | B2 | US2012105044 | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03461 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8581443 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2013 | B2 | US2011012432 | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010IB52587 | 10.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5599875B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2014 | B2 | JP2012529263 | 15.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010IB52587 | 10.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5571177B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2014 | B2 | JP2012529261 | 15.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03461 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012529260 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03460 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2441157 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010IB52587 | 10.06.2010 | EP10728354 | 10.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2441155 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2019 | B1 | EP2441155 | 18.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03461 | 09.06.2010 | EP10722965 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2262091 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2262078 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102884709B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B | CN102884709 | 16.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03461 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102460930B | Global Dossier | 27.05.2015 | B | CN102460930 | 16.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010IB52587 | 10.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102460901B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2015 | B | CN102460901 | 16.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03460 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2764814 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2016 | C | CA2764814 | 16.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010IB52587 | 10.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2764684 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2016 | C | CA2764684 | 16.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03460 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2441156 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2018 | B1 | EP2441156 | 18.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03460 | 09.06.2010 | EP10724712 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2764685 | 16.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03461 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2733089T | 27.11.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | WO2010EP03461 | 09.06.2010 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010142434 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2011 | A3 | WO2010142434 | 16.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010142433 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2011 | A3 | WO2010142433 | 16.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5913515B | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | B2 | JP2015073430 | 16.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09007667 | 10.06.2009 | EP09007662 | 10.06.2009 |