EP2438801 - PLASMA GENERATION DEVICE WITH ELECTRON CYCLOTRON RESONANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELAUNAY, Marc-Yves 17 allée des Eyminées F-38240 Meylan / FR | 02 /
HITZ, Denis 5 avenue du Grand Chatelet F-38000 Grenoble / FR | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Lebkiri, Alexandre Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25, Rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Lebkiri, Alexandre Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 87 Rue Taitbout 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10724769.4 | 04.06.2010 | WO2010EP57838 | Priority number, date | FR20090053740 | 05.06.2009 Original published format: FR 0953740 | [2012/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010139788 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2438801 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/46, H01J37/32 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
H01J37/32678 (EP,US);
H05H1/46 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | PLASMAERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT ELEKTRON-ZYKLOTRON-RESONANZ | [2012/15] | English: | PLASMA GENERATION DEVICE WITH ELECTRON CYCLOTRON RESONANCE | [2012/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE PLASMAS À LA RÉSONANCE CYCLOTRON ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH05343357 (F T L KK) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] - [0012] - [0015] , [0016] , [0018] - [0020] * [Y] 5,9-12,18-21; | [YA]US4996077 (MOSLEHI MEHRDAD M [US], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract * [A] 1-4,6-21; | [A]WO2006103287 (RC LUX [FR], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US5189446 (BARNES MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [YDA]US2004265137 (BAR-GADDA RONNY [US]) [YD] 9-12 * abstract * * claims 24,27 * [A] 13-17; | [YA]JP2006012575 (ULVAC CORP) [Y] 21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * [A] 1-20; | [Y]WO2006073237 (KIM SOON OK [KR]) [Y] 18-20 * abstract * |