EP2413736 - APPLICATOR DEVICE FOR COSMETIC AND/OR MEDICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Munz, Jutta Maximiliansplatz 18 80333 München / DE | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10724997.1 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010DE00342 | Priority number, date | DE20091014976 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009014976 | [2012/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010111997 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2413736 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A61H15/00, A61H15/02 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
A45D34/041 (EP,KR,US);
A61H15/00 (EP,US);
A61H15/0085 (EP,US);
A61H15/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61H23/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/0616 (EP,KR,US);
A45D2200/155 (EP,KR,US);
A45D2200/207 (EP,KR,US);
A61F7/03 (EP,US);
A61F7/106 (EP,US);
A61H2015/0064 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0214 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0278 (EP,US);
A61H2201/105 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | APPLIKATOREINRICHTUNG ZUR KOSMETISCHEN UND/ODER MEDIZINISCHEN ANWENDUNG | [2012/06] | English: | APPLICATOR DEVICE FOR COSMETIC AND/OR MEDICAL USE | [2012/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF APPLICATEUR POUR UTILISATION COSMÉTIQUE ET/OU MÉDICALE | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 27.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1955610 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,11,12,17 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 106] , [ 116] , [0117] , [ 135] , [ 142] , [ 243] - [0247] - [0257] - [0263] - [0280]; figures 7-10, 69 * [I] 2; | [I]US2003165550 (RHOADES DEAN L [US]) [I] 1,2,8,11-15,17-22 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 22] , [0 24] - [0026] - [0 30] , [0 32] , [0 36] - [0040] - [0 42] , [0043] , [0044]; figures 3,4 *; | [XAYI]EP1797847 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,13,17,22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0097] , [0098] , [0108] - [0110] - [0179] , [0240] - [0242] - [ 261] - [0263]; figures 44, 51; claims 1,42 * [A] 5 [Y] 1-3,8,11,13-15,17,22 [I] 2,3,8,11,14-16; | [A]DE3905517 (RÜRUP, HANS-CRISTIAN) [A] 1,3,4,8,15,17-22 * column 1, lines 37-49, 68; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 1-55 * * column 3, lines 44-54 *; | [Y]US2006287616 (NAN SIMON S M [CA]) [Y] 1-3,8,11,13-15,17,22 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 23] , [0024] , [0028] , [0030]; figures 1-6,9 *; | [A]US2006258962 (KOPANIC ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8-15,17,22 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0017] , [0018] , [0 21] , [0 36] - [0041] - [0043] - [0047] - [0 59]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US7252091 (WAYNE JIM [US], et al) [A] 3,6,9 * column 2, lines 36-61; figures 3,4 * * column 4, lines 32-45 *; | [A]WO2008131079 (WANG SEAN XIAOLU [US]) [A] 1,8,17-20,22 * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 21; figures 1a-4 * | by applicant | US2006067962 | WO03000089 | DE19942566 | WO2004043534 |