EP2442652 - FUNGICIDAL MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIETZ, Jochen Pfinztalstr. 7a 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
GROTE, Thomas Im Höhnhausen 18 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
HADEN, Egon Bayernstrasse 55 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Bernd Stockingerstr. 7 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
LOHMANN, Jan Klaas Mühltorstrasse 2a 67245 Lambsheim / DE | 06 /
RENNER, Jens Balthasar-Neumann-Str. 17 67246 Dirmstein / DE | 07 /
ULMSCHNEIDER, Sarah Balthasar Neumann Str. 17 67246 Dirmstein / DE | 08 /
GLÄTTLI, Alice Feuerwehrstrasse 10 60435 Frankfurt / DE | 09 /
VRETTOU-SCHULTES, Marianna Am Oberen Luisenpark 22 68165 Mannheim / DE | 10 /
GRAMMENOS, Wassilios Alexander-Fleming-Str. 13 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/17] | Application number, filing date | 10725146.4 | 11.06.2010 | WO2010EP58227 | Priority number, date | EP20090163125 | 18.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09163125 | [2012/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010145999 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2442652 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/653, A01N55/10, A01N37/50, A01P3/00 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N37/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N47/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/50, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N37/50, A01N35/04, A01N37/46, A01N43/40, A01N43/653, A01N43/84 (US,EP);
A01N43/40, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/40, A01N37/46 (EP,US);
A01N43/56, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/56, A01N43/84 (US,EP);
A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/653, A01N35/04, A01N37/34, A01N37/46, A01N37/46, A01N37/50, A01N37/50, A01N43/40, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/56, A01N43/653, A01N43/653, A01N43/84, A01N43/84, A01N47/14, A01N47/14, A01N47/24, A01N47/34, A01N47/38 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE MISCHUNGEN | [2012/17] | English: | FUNGICIDAL MIXTURES | [2012/17] | French: | MÉLANGES FONGICIDES | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 10.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007010401 (NOON ROBERT A [GB], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] *; | [X]WO2007068421 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 1 - line 8 *; | [X]WO2007036355 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, paragraph 3 *; | [YD]DE19520095 (BAYER AG [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * figure Ia * * table 1 * * page 13, line 62 - page 14, line 68 *; | [A]JP2001206808 (SANKYO CO) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - TOMLIN D D S, "705 prothioconazole", E-PESTICIDE MANUAL,, no. VERSION 4.0, ISBN 978-1-901396-42-3, (20060701), pages 1 - 2, (20090406), XP002557155 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - TOMLIN C D S, "751 simeconazole", E-PESTICIDE MANUAL,, no. VERSION 4.0, ISBN 978-1-901396-42-3, (20060701), pages 1 - 2, (20061027), XP002557156 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - CAN. J. PLANT SCI., (1968), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 587 - 94 | - STAND DER TECHNIK UND PFLANZENSCHUTZ-NACHRICHTEN BAYER 57/2004, vol. 2, pages 145 - 162 | - BROWNING, "Agglomeration", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, (19671204), pages 147 - 48 | - COLBY, S. R., "Calculating synergistic and antagonistic responses of herbicide Combinations", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22, XP001112961 |