EP2442969 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE TRANSVERSE CURVE OF A GENERALLY CYLINDRICAL RECEIVING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 12 cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Société de Technologie MICHELIN 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAMOND, Philippe Les Fontêtes F-63230 Saint Ours Les Roches / FR | 02 /
DENOUEIX, Jean-Yves 9 rue Sous-les-Bois Les Mauvaises F-63112 Blanzat / FR | 03 /
GUERINON, Bernard 4 rue des Hauts-de-Chanturgue F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Reynaud, Georges M. F. P. Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux SGD/LG/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Reynaud, Georges M. F. P. Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux SGD/LG/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10725167.0 | 14.06.2010 | WO2010EP58297 | Priority number, date | FR20090002998 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: FR 0902998 | [2012/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010146011 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2442969 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/24, B29D30/70 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
B29D30/242 (EP,US);
B29D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER QUERBIEGELINIE EINER GENERELL ZYLINDERFÖRMIGEN AUFNAHMEFLÄCHE | [2012/17] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE TRANSVERSE CURVE OF A GENERALLY CYLINDRICAL RECEIVING SURFACE | [2012/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DU GALBE TRANSVERSAL D'UNE SURFACE DE RÉCEPTION DE FORME GÉNÉRALEMENT CYLINDRIQUE | [2013/12] |
Former [2012/17] | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DU GALBE TRANSVERSAL D'UNE SURFACE DE RECEPTION DE FORME GENERALEMENT CYLINDRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 01.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5032198 (KOJIMA YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 13, line 62 - column 14, line 47 *; | [A]EP0502695 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0615866 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 33 - line 52; figure 1 * * page 5, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]JPH06320911 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] *; | [A]EP0638410 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 48 - column 7, line 22; figure - *; | [A]EP1769944 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0010]; figure -; claims 7-14 *; | [A]EP2018977 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0031]; figures 2,3 * |