EP2430647 - LIGHT SOURCE POWERED BY MICROWAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/12] | LIGHT SOURCE | ||
[2015/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceravision Limited The Mansion Bletchley Park Wilton Avenue Bletchley, Milton Keynes MK3 6EB / GB | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEATE, Andrew Simon 5 Phillips Road Fairford Leys Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP19 7FN / GB | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | [2015/37] |
Former [2012/12] | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | Application number, filing date | 10725235.5 | 06.05.2010 | [2015/37] | WO2010GB00911 | Priority number, date | GB20090007947 | 08.05.2009 Original published format: GB 0907947 | US20090186352P | 11.06.2009 Original published format: US 186352 P | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010128301 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2430647 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430647 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01J65/04 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H01J65/044 (EP,KR,US);
H05B41/2806 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2237/24405 (KR);
Y02B20/00 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENLAMPE | [2015/18] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE POWERED BY MICROWAVES | [2015/18] | French: | SOURCE LUMINEUSE A MICRO-ONDES | [2015/18] |
Former [2012/12] | LICHTQUELLE | ||
Former [2012/12] | LIGHT SOURCE | ||
Former [2012/12] | SOURCE LUMINEUSE | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 02.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.03.2015 | 25.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees DK, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 02.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.02.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 02.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.02.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2010 | AL | 09.09.2015 | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | IE | 06.05.2016 | LU | 06.05.2016 | ES | 07.05.2016 | SE | 07.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
ES | 07.05.2016 | ||
SE | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
ES | 07.05.2016 | ||
SE | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
ES | 07.05.2016 | ||
SE | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
ES | 07.05.2016 | ||
SE | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
SE | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
SE | 07.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [IY]US4041352 (MCNEILL WILLIAM H, et al) [I] 16,17,24,25 * the whole document *[Y] 2,18; | [XY]JPS6255858 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,6 * abstract * [Y] 2,18 | Examination | US4673846 |