EP2443429 - ASSEMBLY FOR DETERMINING THE PRESSURE IN A LANDING GEAR TIRE OF AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lufthansa Technik AG Weg beim Jäger 193 22335 Hamburg / DE | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Manfred Königsberger Strasse 22 55299 Nackenheim / DE | 02 /
SCHÖLLMANN, Stefan Schweffelstrasse 9 24118 Kiel / DE | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10725625.7 | 17.06.2010 | WO2010EP03675 | Priority number, date | DE20091025245 | 17.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009025245 | [2012/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010145830 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2443429 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01L17/00, B60C23/06 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G01L17/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN DES DRUCKES IN EINEM FAHRWERKSREIFEN EINES LUFTFAHRZEUGS | [2012/17] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR DETERMINING THE PRESSURE IN A LANDING GEAR TIRE OF AN AIRCRAFT | [2012/17] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER LA PRESSION DANS UN PNEU DE TRAIN D'ATTERRISSAGE D'AVION | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 22.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0656269 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * page 9, lines 8-12; figures 1,3a,3b; claim 10 * [Y] 2-5,8-10 [I] 11-14; | [Y]WO0011442 (BLUEGROUND RES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 2-5,8-10* page 7, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]WO2006003467 (WHEELRIGHT LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 2-5,8-10 * paragraphs [0098] , [0101] , [0107]; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0656269 | WO2008034411 | WO2008034414 |