EP2443786 - WHITE-BOX CRYPTOGRAPHIC SYSTEM WITH CONFIGURABLE KEY USING INTERMEDIATE DATA MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irdeto B.V. 105 Taurus Avenue 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | [2015/12] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Irdeto Corporate B.V. 105 Taurus Avenue 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | ||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Irdeto B.V. Taurusavenue 105 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHIELS, Wilhelmus Petrus Adrianus Johannus Prof. Holstlaan 4 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/17] | Pelly, Jason Charles, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10725723.0 | 17.06.2010 | WO2010EP58590 | Priority number, date | EP20090163250 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09163250 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010146139 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2443786 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
H04L9/002 (EP,US);
G09C1/00 (EP,US);
H04L2209/16 (EP,US);
H04L2209/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | KRYPOGRAFISCHES WHITE-BOX-SYSTEM MIT KONFIGURIERBAREM SCHLÜSSEL MITTELS ZWISCHENDATENÄNDERUNG | [2012/17] | English: | WHITE-BOX CRYPTOGRAPHIC SYSTEM WITH CONFIGURABLE KEY USING INTERMEDIATE DATA MODIFICATION | [2012/17] | French: | SYSTÈME CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE STRUCTUREL AVEC CLÉ CONFIGURABLE UTILISANT UNE MODIFICATION DE DONNÉES INTERMÉDIAIRE | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 26.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 18.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/11] | 25.10.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2008142612 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]US2006140401 (JOHNSON HAROLD J [CA], et al) [I] 1-14 * figures 10,18,22-25 *; | [A]FR2820577 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 8, lines 4-14 *; | [T] - CHOW S ET AL, "WHITE-BOX CRYPTOGRAPHY AND AN AES IMPLEMENTATION", SELECTED AREAS IN CRYPTOGRAPHY : 9TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ; REVISED PAPERS / SAC 2002, ST. JOHN'S, NEWFOUNDLAND, CANADA, AUGUST 15 20020815; 20020815 - 20020816 SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN (DE), (20020815), vol. 2595, ISBN 978-3-540-00622-0, pages 250 - 270, XP002521155 [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2008142612 | US2006140401 |