EP2440261 - A CATHETER LOCKING SOLUTION HAVING ANTIMICROBIAL AND ANTICOAGULATION PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2016/49] |
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | ||
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07414 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLEY, John, J., III 319 Hamilton Avenue Glen Rock New Jersey 07452 / US | 02 /
VALDES, Thelma, I. 33 B. Hazen Court Wayne New Jersey 07470 / US | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/34] |
Former [2012/16] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10727302.1 | 10.06.2010 | [2016/34] | WO2010US38127 | Priority number, date | US20090186173P | 11.06.2009 Original published format: US 186173 P | US20100797336 | 09.06.2010 Original published format: US 797336 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010144674 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2440261 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2440261 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/06, A61L29/14, A61L29/16, A61M25/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61L33/0041 (US);
A61K31/245 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61L29/06 (US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L33/04 (US);
A61L33/068 (US);
A61P23/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61L2300/402 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2300/42 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0019 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0056 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/245, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHETER-BLOCK-LÖSUNG MIT ANTIMIKROBIELLEN UND GERINNUNGSHEMMENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2012/16] | English: | A CATHETER LOCKING SOLUTION HAVING ANTIMICROBIAL AND ANTICOAGULATION PROPERTIES | [2012/16] | French: | SOLUTION BOUCHON POUR CATHÉTER DOTÉE DE PROPRIÉTÉS ANTIMICROBIENNES ET D'ANTI-COAGULATION | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 21.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2010 | AL | 24.08.2016 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | IS | 24.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 10.06.2010 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 10.06.2010 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.06.2010 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.06.2010 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.08.2016 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0010385 (ASH MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * claim 39 *; | [A]WO2004108093 (ASEPTICA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30* page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 24; claims 18,33 *; | [A]EP1688154 (ASH ACCESS TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * claim 1 * | Examination | - MITCHELL DAVID TOBIAS ET AL., "Lidocaine and bupivacaine exert differential effects on whole blood coagulation", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ANESTHESIA, New York, (1999), vol. 11, pages 52 - 55 | - SVENA M. JOHNSON ET AL., "Local anesthetics as antimicrobial agents: A review", SURGICAL INFECTIONS, (2008), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 205 - 213, XP009148578 |