EP2442659 - USE OF A CONTROL AGENT FOR SOFT ROT AND CONTROL METHOD FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/17] | CONTROL AGENT FOR SOFT ROT AND CONTROL METHOD FOR THE SAME | ||
[2015/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ishihara Sangyo Kaisha, Ltd. 3-15 Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURATA, Yoshikazu c/o ISK BIOSCIENCES K.K. 10-30 Fujimi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0071 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Hiroyuki c/o Ishihara Sangyo Kaisha Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 3-1 Nishi-shibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-0025 / JP | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/13] |
Former [2012/17] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10727509.1 | 04.06.2010 | [2016/13] | WO2010JP03727 | Priority number, date | JP20090144191 | 17.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009144191 | JP20100004308 | 12.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010004308 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010146791 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2442659 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2442659 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01P3/00, A01N43/40 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | 22.12.2011 | ME | 22.12.2011 | RS | 22.12.2011 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES MITTELS GEGEN WEICHFÄULE UND DESSEN VERFAHREN | [2015/44] | English: | USE OF A CONTROL AGENT FOR SOFT ROT AND CONTROL METHOD FOR THE SAME | [2015/44] | French: | UTLISATION D'AGENT DE LUTTE CONTRE LA POURRITURE MOLLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CORRESPONDANT | [2015/44] |
Former [2012/17] | MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON MODERFÄULE | ||
Former [2012/17] | CONTROL AGENT FOR SOFT ROT AND CONTROL METHOD FOR THE SAME | ||
Former [2012/17] | AGENT DE LUTTE CONTRE LA POURRITURE MOLLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 24.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | IE | 04.06.2016 | LU | 04.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 30.03.2016 | |
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
LU | 04.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | CY | 30.03.2016 | |
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
LU | 04.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 30.03.2016 | |
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
LU | 04.06.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3965109 (TOMLIN CLIVE DUDLEY SPENCER, et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * tables 1,15,16 * [I] 3-6,9,10; | [XP]CN101653132 (DONGGUAN CITY RUIDEFENG BIOLOG) [XP] 1-10* the whole document * | by applicant | JPS5692272 | WO2005092104 |