|
17.01.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.01.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
23.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
24.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
22 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |