EP2433377 - SYSTEM FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF RADIO-FREQUENCY SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/13] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF RADIO-FREQUENCY SIGNALS | ||
[2018/02] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JMA Wireless B.V. Herikerbergweg 238 Luna Arena 1101 CM Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | [2018/15] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states JMA Wireless B.V. Herikerbergweg 238 Luna Arena 1101 CM Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states John Mezzalingua Associates Holdings B.V. Herikerbergweg 238 Luna Arena 1101 CM Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Teko Telecom S.r.l. Via Meucci, 24/A 40024 Castel San Pietro Terme (BO) / IT | ||
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Teko Telecom S.p.A. Via Meucci, 24A 40024 Castel San Pietro Terme (BO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTARGIACOMO, Massimo Via Berlinguer 3/b/8 I-48020 S. Agata sul Santerno / IT | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Brunacci, Marco, et al BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Scaglia Est, 19-31 41126 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2012/13] | Brunacci, Marco Brunacci & Partners S.r.l. Via Giardini, 625 41125 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 10727836.8 | 17.05.2010 | [2018/15] | WO2010IB01150 | Priority number, date | IT2009MO00135 | 19.05.2009 Original published format: IT MO20090135 | [2012/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010133942 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2433377 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2433377 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2433377 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/2575, H04W88/08 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
H04B10/25758 (EP,US);
H04B10/25753 (US);
H04W88/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | H04B10/12, H04W88/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERTEILUNG VON FUNKFREQUENZSIGNALEN | [2018/02] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF RADIO-FREQUENCY SIGNALS | [2018/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE SIGNAUX RADIOÉLECTRIQUES | [2018/02] |
Former [2012/13] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF RADIO-FREQUENCY SIGNALS | ||
Former [2012/13] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF RADIO-FREQUENCY SIGNALS | ||
Former [2012/13] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE SIGNAUX RADIOÉLECTRIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 24.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2015
13.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE Andrew Wireless Systems GmbH Industriering 10 86675 Buchendorf / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2015
13.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE Andrew Wireless Systems GmbH Industriering 10 86675 Buchendorf / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2015/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2015
Andrew Wireless Systems GmbH Industriering 10 86675 Buchendorf / DE Opponent's representative Schröder, Christoph Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | 12.08.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.06.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.03.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2010 | AL | 08.10.2014 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | SM | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | IE | 17.05.2015 | LU | 17.05.2015 | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 17.05.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2018/45] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 17.05.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 17.05.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 17.05.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 17.05.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 17.05.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 17.05.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 08.10.2014 | |
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5657374 (RUSSELL DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * figure 29 *; | [A]WO9816054 (MVS INC [US]) [A] 1-29 * page 6, line 6 - line 14 * * page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 5 * * page 9, line 29 - line 32 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US2004110534 (CHUNG SAE-YOUNG [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0065] * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO2008012865 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract ** figures 3,7 * |